Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/03/2021 at 13:18:50 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS LESTER MEJIA-ZELAYA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/10/2019 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LESTER MEJIA-ZELAYA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9418

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

MEJIA-ZELAYA LESTER

MEJIA ORTEGA MARJORIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHOECK MICHAEL D.

Defendant Attorney

COLE ONICA VALLE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

3/12/2021: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/12/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (Conditio...)

3/12/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (Conditio...)

Notice of Change of Firm Name - Notice of Change of Firm Name

11/13/2020: Notice of Change of Firm Name - Notice of Change of Firm Name

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

9/16/2020: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/1/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF TRISTAN P ESPINOSA ESQ ISO MOTION TO DEEM RFA'S ADMITTED

6/23/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF TRISTAN P ESPINOSA ESQ ISO MOTION TO DEEM RFA'S ADMITTED

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF TRISTAN P ESPINOSA ESQ ISO MOTION TO DEEM RFA'S ADMITTED

6/23/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF TRISTAN P ESPINOSA ESQ ISO MOTION TO DEEM RFA'S ADMITTED

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/23/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

6/23/2020: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted - Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

6/23/2020: Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted - Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 06/23/2020

6/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 06/23/2020

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

6/23/2020: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/5/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer - Answer

12/10/2019: Answer - Answer

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/10/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF VENUE

10/10/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF VENUE

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

10/10/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2022
  • Hearing10/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • Hearing09/27/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) Conditional scheduled for 09/27/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: LESTER MEJIA-ZELAYA (Defendant); MARJORIE MEJIA ORTEGA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (Conditio...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (Conditio...) of 03/12/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 03/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- ONICA VALLE COLE (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Law Offices of Francine B. Kelly & Associates to Law Offices of Thomas D. Pokladowski & Associates

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by: MARJORIE MEJIA ORTEGA (Defendant); New Firm Name: Law Offices of Thomas D. Pokladowski & Associates

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted: Filed By: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 10/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: MARJORIE MEJIA ORTEGA (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/12/2019; Service Cost: 89.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: LESTER MEJIA-ZELAYA (Defendant); MARJORIE MEJIA ORTEGA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: LESTER MEJIA-ZELAYA (Defendant); MARJORIE MEJIA ORTEGA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDeclaration DECLARATION OF VENUE; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: LESTER MEJIA-ZELAYA (Defendant); MARJORIE MEJIA ORTEGA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: LESTER MEJIA-ZELAYA (Defendant); MARJORIE MEJIA ORTEGA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC09418    Hearing Date: October 05, 2020    Dept: 26

State Farm v. Mejia-Zelaya, et al

MOTION TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION ADMITTED

(CCP § 2033.280)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company’s Motions to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted Against Defendants Lester Mejia-Zelaya and Marjorie Mejia Ortega are GRANTED. DEFENDANTS ARE EACH TO PAY SANCTIONS OF $260.00 TO PLAINTIFF’S COUNSEL WITHIN 20 DAYS’ NOTICE OF THIS ORDER.

ANALYSIS:

On February 10, 2020, Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (“Plaintiff”) served Requests for Admissions on Defendants Lester Mejia-Zelaya and Marjorie Mejia Ortega (“Defendant”). (Motions, Espinosa Decl., Exh. A.) To date, Plaintiff has not received any verified responses to the discovery requests propounded on Defendant. (Id. at p. 1:25-26.) As a result, Plaintiff filed the instant Motions to Deem the Truth of Matters Specified in Requests for Admissions Admitted and for Monetary Sanctions (the “Motion”) against Defendants on June 23, 2020. To date, no opposition has been filed.

Discussion

Defendants have not provided verified responses to the discovery propounded by Plaintiff on February 10, 2020. (Id. at p. 1:23-27.) There is no requirement for a prior meet and confer effort before a motion to deem requests for admission can be filed. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2033.280.) Further, the motion can be brought any time after the responding party fails to provide the responses. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2033.280.)

The Court also finds the failure to respond a misuse of the discovery process. Sanctions are appropriate under Code of Civil Procedure sections 2023.010, 2023.030 and 2033.280, and have been properly noticed. Sanctions are granted against Defendants each in the amount of $260.00, based on one hour of attorney time billed at $200.00 per hour, plus the $60.00 filing fee. (Id. at p. 2:1-4.)

Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company’s Motions to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted Against Defendants Lester Mejia-Zelaya and Marjorie Mejia Ortega are GRANTED. DEFENDANTS ARE EACH TO PAY SANCTIONS OF $260.00 TO PLAINTIFF’S COUNSEL WITHIN 20 DAYS’ NOTICE OF THIS ORDER.

Moving party to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHOECK MICHAEL D