This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/28/2021 at 11:17:51 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS LEONARDO GOMEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/30/2020 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LEONARDO GOMEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6378

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

GOMEZ LEONARDO

CARRANCO GERARDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PLEASANT JOSEPH M.

Defendant Attorney

BORROMEO IRENE GAVIOLA

 

Court Documents

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF VENUE

7/30/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF VENUE

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/30/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/30/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons (Joint Debtor) - Summons (Joint Debtor)

7/30/2020: Summons (Joint Debtor) - Summons (Joint Debtor)

Complaint - Complaint

7/30/2020: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

7/30/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/21/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

8/21/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Answer - Answer

11/6/2020: Answer - Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2023
  • Hearing08/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • Hearing01/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: LEONARDO GOMEZ (Defendant); GERARDO CARRANCO (Defendant); As to: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: LEONARDO GOMEZ (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/17/2020; Service Cost: 89.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: GERARDO CARRANCO (Defendant); Service Date: 08/16/2020; Service Cost: 89.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: LEONARDO GOMEZ (Defendant); GERARDO CARRANCO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketDeclaration DECLARATION OF VENUE; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: LEONARDO GOMEZ (Defendant); GERARDO CARRANCO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketSummons (Joint Debtor); Issued and Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: LEONARDO GOMEZ (Defendant); GERARDO CARRANCO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: LEONARDO GOMEZ (Defendant); GERARDO CARRANCO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARLAN M. REESE & ASSOCIATES - JOSEPH M. PLEASANT