Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/28/2021 at 03:29:01 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS LEON DONTAE WATSON

Case Summary

On 12/30/2020 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LEON DONTAE WATSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0761

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

WATSON LEON DONTAE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENSON SUSAN M

Defendant Attorney

DACEY JENNIFER M.

 

Court Documents

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

3/17/2021: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/17/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer - Answer

3/17/2021: Answer - Answer

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

2/9/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/30/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/30/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

12/30/2020: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

12/30/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/30/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2024
  • Hearing01/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • Hearing06/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Leon Dontae Watson (Defendant); As to: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Leon Dontae Watson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Leon Dontae Watson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Leon Dontae Watson (Defendant); Service Date: 01/16/2021; Service Cost: 67.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Leon Dontae Watson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Leon Dontae Watson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Leon Dontae Watson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENSON SUSAN M