This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/25/2021 at 03:29:49 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS KRYS ASH SCHEMPP

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KRYS ASH SCHEMPP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9907

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

SCHEMPP KRYS ASH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GENCHEL ROBIN F

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/25/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

11/25/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/25/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

11/25/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/25/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

3/2/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketAddress for Robin F Genchel (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY on 11/25/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: KRYS ASH SCHEMPP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: KRYS ASH SCHEMPP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: KRYS ASH SCHEMPP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GENCHEL ROBIN F