Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/28/2021 at 00:21:42 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS KEITH LEE

Case Summary

On 02/25/2019 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KEITH LEE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2003

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

LEE KEITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REESE BREANNE L.

Defendant Attorney

BURGOS RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF TRISTAN ESPINOSA ESQ ISO MOTION TO DEEM RFA'S ADMITTED

2/8/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF TRISTAN ESPINOSA ESQ ISO MOTION TO DEEM RFA'S ADMITTED

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/8/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted - Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

2/8/2021: Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted - Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

2/8/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order TO CONTINUE TRIAL

2/10/2021: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted)

3/23/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted)

Answer - Answer

6/12/2020: Answer - Answer

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order STIPULATION OF ALL PARTIES TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

8/10/2020: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order STIPULATION OF ALL PARTIES TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/1/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/25/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

2/25/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF VENUE

2/25/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF VENUE

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/25/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

2/25/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/25/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2021
  • Hearing10/25/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted scheduled for 03/23/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 03/23/2021; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/26/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Party was rescheduled to 10/25/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted scheduled for 03/23/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketMotion to Deem RFA's Admitted; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: KEITH LEE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketDeclaration OF TRISTAN ESPINOSA ESQ ISO MOTION TO DEEM RFA'S ADMITTED; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: KEITH LEE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Party was rescheduled to 04/26/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: KEITH LEE (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/29/2019; Service Cost: 79.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: KEITH LEE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: KEITH LEE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: KEITH LEE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketDeclaration DECLARATION OF VENUE; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: KEITH LEE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC02003    Hearing Date: March 23, 2021    Dept: 25

HEARING DATE: Tue., March 23, 2021 JUDGE /DEPT: Blancarte/25

CASE NAME: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. v. Lee

CASE NUMBER: 19STLC02003 COMPL. FILED: 02-25-19

NOTICE: OK DISC. C/O: 09-25-21

DISC. MOT. C/O: 10-10-21

TRIAL DATE: 10-25-21

PROCEEDINGS: MOTION TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION ADMITTED

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

RESP. PARTY: None

MOTION TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION ADMITTED

(CCP § 2033.280)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company’s Motion to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted is GRANTED.

SERVICE:

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

OPPOSITION: None filed as of March 19, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of March 19, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background

On February 25, 2021, Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (“Plaintiff”) filed an action against Keith Lee (“Defendant”). Defendant filed an Answer on June 12, 2020.

Plaintiff filed the instant Motion to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted (the “Motion”) on February 8, 2021. To date, no opposition has been filed.

  1. Legal Standard & Discussion

A party must respond to requests for admissions within 30 days after service of such requests. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2033.250, subd. (a).) “If a party to whom requests for admission are directed fails to serve a timely response…(a) [that party] waives any objection to the requests, including one based on privilege or on the protection for work product…” (Code Civ. Proc., § 2033.280, subd. (a).) “The requesting party may move for an order that the genuineness of any documents and the truth of any matters specified in the requests be deemed admitted, as well as for a monetary sanction under Chapter 7.” (Id. at subd. (b).) A motion dealing with the failure to respond, rather than with inadequate responses, does not require the requesting party to meet and confer with the responding party. (Deymer v. Costa Mesa Mobile Home Estates (1995) 36 Cal.App.4th 393, 395, fn. 4 [disapproved on other grounds in Wilcox v. Birtwhistle (1999) 21 Cal.4th 973]. There is no time limit within which a motion to have matters deemed admitted must be made. (Brigante v. Huang (1993) 20 Cal.App.4th 1569, 1585.)

Plaintiff served Defendant with Requests for Admission, Set One, on June 24, 2020 via regular mail. (Mot., Espinosa Decl., ¶ 1, Exh. A.) Although not statutorily required, Plaintiff sent Defendant’s counsel a meet and confer letter regarding the lack of responses. (Id. at ¶ 3, Exh. B.) As of the date of this Motion, Defendant has not provided any responses. (Id. at ¶ 5.) Thus, Plaintiff is entitled to an order deeming the Requests for Admission, Set One, admitted against Defendant. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2033.280.)

Although sanctions for the failure to respond are permitted by Code of Civil Procedure sections 2023.030, subdivision (a), and mandatory under Section 2033.280, subdivision (c), Plaintiff requests that no sanctions be imposed against Defendant at this time. (Mot., p. 2:18-20.) Thus, no sanctions are awarded.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company’s Motion to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted is GRANTED.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REESE BREANNE L.