Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/18/2021 at 05:31:00 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS JUAN CABRALES

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JUAN CABRALES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9455

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

CABRALES JUAN AKA JUAN REYES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ESPINOSA TRISTAN P

Defendant Attorney

FARKHONDEH TARA

 

Court Documents

Answer - Answer

12/18/2020: Answer - Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/18/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/10/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence

12/7/2020: Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence

Complaint - Complaint

11/9/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF VENUE

11/9/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF VENUE

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/9/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/9/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

11/9/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/9/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2023
  • Hearing11/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • Hearing05/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: JUAN CABRALES (Defendant); As to: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: JUAN CABRALES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: JUAN CABRALES (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/02/2020; Service Cost: 80.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: JUAN CABRALES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: JUAN CABRALES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: JUAN CABRALES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: JUAN CABRALES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketDeclaration OF VENUE; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: JUAN CABRALES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ESPINOSA, TRISTAN P.