Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/26/2021 at 02:35:16 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS JOSE ORTIZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/19/2020 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOSE ORTIZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9707

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

ORTIZ REYES EDGARDO

ORTIZ JOSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAGPAPIAN MANUEL M

Defendant Attorney

NEPOMUCENO ERWIN A.

 

Court Documents

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

2/16/2021: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Answer - Answer

2/16/2021: Answer - Answer

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

12/22/2020: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

12/9/2020: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Complaint - Complaint

11/19/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/19/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/19/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

11/19/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/19/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2023
  • Hearing11/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • Hearing05/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: JOSE ORTIZ (Defendant); EDGARDO ORTIZ REYES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: JOSE ORTIZ (Defendant); EDGARDO ORTIZ REYES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: JOSE ORTIZ (Defendant); Mailing Date: 12/01/2020; Service Cost: 70.00; Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: EDGARDO ORTIZ REYES (Defendant); Mailing Date: 11/29/2020; Service Cost: 70.00; Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: JOSE ORTIZ (Defendant); EDGARDO ORTIZ REYES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: JOSE ORTIZ (Defendant); EDGARDO ORTIZ REYES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: JOSE ORTIZ (Defendant); EDGARDO ORTIZ REYES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAGPAPIAN MANUEL M