This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/09/2021 at 01:20:03 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS JORGE LUIS CORTES

Case Summary

On 04/05/2019 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JORGE LUIS CORTES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3373

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

CORTES JORGE LUIS AKA JORGE L. OROZCO CORTES

LOYA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Not Classified By Court

LOYA CASUALTY INSURANCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENSON SUSAN M

Defendant Attorneys

MESSINA IRENE

FARKHONDEH TARA

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

6/2/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

6/2/2021: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Intervene)

2/16/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Intervene)

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

2/18/2021: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

1/4/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

Motion for Leave (name extension) - Motion for Leave LOYA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANYS NOTICE AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF IRENE C. MESSINA,

1/6/2021: Motion for Leave (name extension) - Motion for Leave LOYA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANYS NOTICE AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF IRENE C. MESSINA,

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Intervene)

1/6/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Intervene)

Motion for Leave to Intervene - Motion for Leave to Intervene

7/16/2020: Motion for Leave to Intervene - Motion for Leave to Intervene

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Jury Trial) of 09/25/2020

9/25/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Jury Trial) of 09/25/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re: Jury Trial)

9/25/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re: Jury Trial)

Answer - Answer

7/25/2019: Answer - Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/25/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/16/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Complaint - Complaint

4/5/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/5/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/5/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

4/5/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/5/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 09/09/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on 04/05/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 09/09/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Settlement: Status Date changed from 06/02/2021 to 06/02/2021; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/08/2022 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 06/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Jorge Luis Cortes (Defendant); Loya Casualty Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Intervene)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Leave to Intervene scheduled for 02/16/2021 at 11:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 02/16/2021; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Jorge Luis Cortes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Jorge Luis Cortes (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/22/2019; Service Cost: 75.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/02/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Jorge Luis Cortes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Jorge Luis Cortes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Jorge Luis Cortes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC03373    Hearing Date: January 06, 2021    Dept: 25

HEARING DATE: Wed., January 6, 2021 JUDGE /DEPT: Blancarte/25

CASE NAME: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. v. Cortes

CASE NUMBER: 19STLC03373 COMP. FILED: 04-05-19

NOTICE: NO (on ¿) DISC. C/O: 05-11-21

MOTION C/O: 05-26-21

TRIAL DATE: 06-10-21

PROCEEDINGS: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE

MOVING PARTY: Prospective Intervenor Loya Casualty Insurance Company

RESP. PARTY: None

MOTION TO INTERVENE

(CCP § 387)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Prospective Intervenor Loya Casualty Insurance Company’s Motion for Leave to Intervene is CONTINUED TO feb 16, 2021 AT 11:00 A.M. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. At least 16 court days before the next scheduled hearing, Loya must file and serve supplemental papers addressing the deficiencies noted herein. Failure to do so may result in the Motion being placed off calendar or denied.

SERVICE:

[ ] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) NO

[ ] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) NO

[ ] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) NO

OPPOSITION: None filed as of January 4, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of January 4, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background

On April 5, 2019, Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (“Plaintiff”) filed an action for motor vehicle negligence against Defendant Jorge Luis Cortes aka Jorge L Orozco Cortes (“Defendant”). Defendant filed his Answer on July 25, 2019.

On July 16, 2020, Prospective Intervenor Loya Casualty Insurance Company (“Loya”) filed the instant Motion for Leave to Intervene (the “Motion”). To date, no opposition has been filed.

  1. Legal Standard

Intervention is permitted when “[t]he person seeking intervention claims an interest relating to the property or transaction that is the subject of the action and that person is so situated that the disposition of the action may impair or impede that person's ability to protect that interest, unless that person's interest is adequately represented by one or more of the existing parties.” (Code Civ. Proc., § 387, subd. (d)(1)(B).) Whether the petitioner has an interest in the matter in litigation is a question of fact that must be determined by the court before leave to file is granted. (Muller v. Robinson (1959) 174 Cal.App.2d 511, 515; In re Yokohama Special Bank (1948) 86 Cal.App.2d 545.) The burden rests on the one seeking to intervene to show that this is a proper case for intervention. (Id. at 515.)

  1. Discussion

As an initial matter, the Court notes that Loya’s Motion is incomplete. Specifically, counsel Irene Messina’s declaration states that Exhibits A, B, and C are attached, but none were filed with the Court. (Mot., Messina Decl., ¶¶ 3-5.) In addition, although this Motion was served on Plaintiff, it was not served on Defendant himself.

Before the Court can address the merits of Loya’s request, it must correct the errors noted above. Accordingly, this hearing is CONTINUED.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Prospective Intervenor Loya Casualty Insurance Company’s Motion for Leave to Intervene is CONTINUED TO feb 16, 2021 AT 11:00 A.M. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. At least 16 court days before the next scheduled hearing, Loya must file and serve supplemental papers addressing the deficiencies noted herein. Failure to do so may result in the Motion being placed off calendar or denied.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOYA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FARKHONDEH TARA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MESSINA IRENE C.