This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 10:15:56 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS JACOB GONZALEZ

Case Summary

On 09/18/2017 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JACOB GONZALEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2263

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

GONZALEZ JACOB

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MENDELSON LEE MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

3/18/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 07/18/2019

7/18/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 07/18/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order) of 07/18/2019

7/18/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order) of 07/18/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

7/18/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 07/18/2019

7/18/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 07/18/2019

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/26/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

10/2/2017: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - on Complaint

9/18/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/18/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/18/2017: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/18/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2020
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 2 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 2 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • Hearingat 10:00 AM in Department 2 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 10/07/2019 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/21/2019 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 09/21/2020 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order) of 07/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 07/18/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 2 - Hon. Georgina T. Rizk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketCase numbers 17STLC02263, BC649502 are related; case number BC649502 is the lead case.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Jacob Gonzalez (Defendant); Service Date: 09/25/2017; Service Cost: 87.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Jacob Gonzalez (Defendant): First Name changed from Jacobg to Jacob

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Docket** Case Name changed from STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY vs JACOBG GONZALEZ to STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY vs JACOB GONZALEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Jacobg Gonzalez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Georgina T. Rizk in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/18/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketOSC - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 17STLC02263    Hearing Date: March 12, 2020    Dept: 29

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. Gonzalez

Plaintiff’s Motion for Order Vacating Entry of Dismissal is GRANTED.

Plaintiff is entitled to mandatory relief from dismissal based on counsel’s mistake in failing to appear at the trial due to his mistaken belief that the matter was consolidated with BC649502. Cal Code Civil Procedure § 473(b). The motion is timely made and supported by the Declaration of Marc. A. Schwarz.

The Court notes that default has been entered against the sole defendant in the case, but no default judgment package has been submitted.

The Court sets the following date:

OSC re dismissal for failure to obtain default judgment: May 14, 2020 at 8:30 a.m.

 Moving Party is ordered to give notice.