This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/16/2021 at 03:09:17 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS IRINA MESROPYAN

Case Summary

On 07/31/2019 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against IRINA MESROPYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7061

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

MESROPYAN IRINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STRUMWASSER GREGG

Defendant Attorneys

HAWLEY MARIA CHAVES

CHAVES MARIA

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Complaint

7/31/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/3/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer - Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

9/17/2021: Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer - Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

Notice (name extension) - Notice of entry of order

8/13/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice of entry of order

Objection (name extension) - Objection DEFENDANTIRINAMESROPYAN'S OBJECTIONTONOTICEOFRULING

8/19/2021: Objection (name extension) - Objection DEFENDANTIRINAMESROPYAN'S OBJECTIONTONOTICEOFRULING

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

8/9/2021: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)

8/9/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)

Opposition (name extension) - Opposition OPPOSITIONTO PLAINTIFFSMOTIONTO COMPELRESPONSESTOFORM INTERROGATORIES

7/26/2021: Opposition (name extension) - Opposition OPPOSITIONTO PLAINTIFFSMOTIONTO COMPELRESPONSESTOFORM INTERROGATORIES

Opposition (name extension) - Opposition TO PLAINTIFFSMOTION TO COMPELRESPONSESTO REQUESTFORPRODUCTIONOF DOCUMENTS,

7/26/2021: Opposition (name extension) - Opposition TO PLAINTIFFSMOTION TO COMPELRESPONSESTO REQUESTFORPRODUCTIONOF DOCUMENTS,

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial and All Related Dates

6/15/2021: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial and All Related Dates

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

6/24/2021: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

6/24/2021: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

4/16/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order TO CONTINUE TRIAL

4/7/2021: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order to set aside default

10/7/2020: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order to set aside default

Answer - Answer

11/5/2020: Answer - Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/5/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order PROPOSED ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

11/24/2020: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order PROPOSED ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2022
  • Hearing03/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • Hearing12/23/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketMotion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer scheduled for 12/23/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketObjection DEFENDANTIRINAMESROPYAN'S OBJECTIONTONOTICEOFRULING; Filed by: IRINA MESROPYAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of entry of order; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: IRINA MESROPYAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Compelling Defendant's Verified Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents, Set One; Request for Monetary Sanctions: Filed By: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 08/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Compelling Defendant's Verified Responses to Plaintiff's Form Interrogatories, Set One; Request for Monetary Sanctions: Filed By: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 08/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2020
  • Docket; On the Complaint filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY on 07/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: IRINA MESROPYAN (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/17/2020; Service Cost: 70.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: IRINA MESROPYAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: IRINA MESROPYAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: IRINA MESROPYAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: 19STLC07061 Hearing Date: August 9, 2021 Dept: 26

State Farm v.\r\nMesropyan, et al. 19STLC07061

MOTION TO\r\nCOMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION; REQUEST FOR\r\nSANCTIONS

\r\n\r\n

(CCP §§ 2030.290, 2031.300)

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

TENTATIVE RULING:

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company’s\r\n(1) Motion To Compel Responses To Form Interrogatories and Request for\r\nSanctions; and (2) Motion To Compel Responses To Demand For Production Of\r\nDocuments and Request for Sanctions are GRANTED. DEFENDANT IRINA MESROPYAN IS\r\nTO SERVE VERIFIED RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTION TO THE DISCOVERY WITHIN 20 DAYS’\r\nSERVICE OF THIS ORDER. DEFENDANT AND COUNSEL OF RECORD ARE JOINTLY AND\r\nSEVERALLY ORDERED TO PAY SANCTIONS TO $570.00 TO PLAINTIFF’S COUNSEL WITHIN 20\r\nDAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER.

ANALYSIS:

Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company\r\n(“Plaintiff”) propounded Form Interrogatories and Requests for Production of\r\nDocuments on Defendant Irina Mesropyan (“Defendant”) on December 16, 2020.\r\n(Motions, Strumwasser Decl., Exh. A.) Following Defendant’s failure to provide\r\ntimely responses, Plaintiff’s counsel sent a meet and confer letter on March\r\n30, 2021. (Id. at Exh. B.) Following no response from Defendant after\r\nthe last deadline, Plaintiff filed the instant (1) Motion To Compel Responses\r\nTo Form Interrogatories, Set One and Request for Sanctions; and (2) Motion To\r\nCompel Responses To Demand For Production Of Documents and Request for\r\nSanctions on June 24, 2021. (Id. at ¶5.)

Based on Defendant’s failure to timely serve initial\r\nresponses, the Motions to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Request for\r\nProduction are granted. There is no requirement for a prior meet and confer\r\neffort before a motion to compel initial responses or deem admissions admitted\r\ncan be filed. (Code Civ. Proc., §§ 2030.290, 2031.300.) Further, the motion can\r\nbe brought any time after the responding party fails to provide the responses.\r\n(Code Civ. Proc., §§ 2030.290, 2031.300.)

Defendant’s failure to timely respond also constitutes a\r\nmisuse of the discovery process. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2023.010, subd. (d).)\r\nSanctions are appropriate under Code of Civil Procedure sections 2023.010 and\r\n2023.030 and have been properly noticed. Nor does the Court find any basis to\r\ndeny the sanctions request because Defendant sought an extension of the time to\r\nrespond and purportedly served responses (copies of which are not attached to\r\nthe oppositions). (See Oppos., p. 2:13-22.) Defendant only reached out to\r\nPlaintiff after the instant discovery Motions were filed and after Plaintiff\r\nhad incurred motion expenses. (Id. at p. 2:9-12.) Nor does Defendant\r\noffer any explanation for failing to respond when Plaintiff sent a meet and\r\nconfer letter three months earlier in March 2021. However, the sanctions amount\r\nsought is excessive under a lodestar calculation. Sanctions are granted against\r\nDefendant and counsel of record in the amount of $570.00 based on one hour of\r\nattorney time billed at $350.00 an hour, plus $120.00 in costs. (Motions, Strumwasser\r\nDecl., ¶6.)

Therefore, Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance\r\nCompany’s (1) Motion To Compel Responses To Form Interrogatories and Request\r\nfor Sanctions; and (2) Motion To Compel Responses To Demand For Production Of\r\nDocuments and Request for Sanctions are GRANTED. DEFENDANT IRINA MESROPYAN IS\r\nTO SERVE VERIFIED RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTION TO THE DISCOVERY WITHIN 20 DAYS’\r\nSERVICE OF THIS ORDER. DEFENDANT AND COUNSEL OF RECORD ARE JOINTLY AND\r\nSEVERALLY ORDERED TO PAY SANCTIONS TO $570.00 TO PLAINTIFF’S COUNSEL WITHIN 20\r\nDAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER.

Moving party to give notice.

\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n

'
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHAVES MARIA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAWLEY MARIA CHAVES