This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 02:51:10 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS INTERLAND INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/07/2018 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against INTERLAND INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7030

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

UVUKA UGO

INTERLAND INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GENCHEL ROBIN FIERER

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/7/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - on Complaint

5/7/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Complaint

5/7/2018: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/7/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/29/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Dismissal

8/8/2018: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

8/15/2018: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/04/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • DocketRequest for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Interland Inc. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/21/18; Service Cost: 135.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Interland Inc. (Defendant); Ugo Uvuka (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Georgina T. Rizk in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/04/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BSW INC is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GENCHEL ROBIN F