This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/06/2021 at 14:14:02 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS GUILLERMO LEDEZMAN, JR.

Case Summary

On 09/24/2018 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GUILLERMO LEDEZMAN, JR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2124

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

LEDEZMAN GUILLERMO JR.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOURO JENNY ROSE

Defendant Attorney

VELLA LOUIS J.

 

Court Documents

Judgment - Judgment on the Pleading

4/5/2021: Judgment - Judgment on the Pleading

Memorandum of Costs (Summary) - Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

3/19/2021: Memorandum of Costs (Summary) - Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration RE INTEREST

3/19/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration RE INTEREST

Trial Brief - Trial Brief

2/17/2021: Trial Brief - Trial Brief

Witness List - Witness List

2/17/2021: Witness List - Witness List

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order - Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

3/9/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order - Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

3/9/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/3/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF BREANNE L REESES ESQ IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DEEM RFA'S ADMITTED

2/3/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF BREANNE L REESES ESQ IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DEEM RFA'S ADMITTED

Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted - Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

2/3/2020: Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted - Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

2/3/2020: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Louis J. Vella Esq. Regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitting

2/27/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Louis J. Vella Esq. Regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitting

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/11/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF BREANNE L REESE ESQ IN SUPPORT OF ORDER PERMITTING SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

2/13/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF BREANNE L REESE ESQ IN SUPPORT OF ORDER PERMITTING SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF KYLE CREASEY IN SUPPORT OF ORDER PERMITTING SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

2/13/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF KYLE CREASEY IN SUPPORT OF ORDER PERMITTING SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

Order for Publication - Order for Publication for Guillermo

6/3/2019: Order for Publication - Order for Publication for Guillermo

Answer - Answer

7/1/2019: Answer - Answer

Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

7/9/2019: Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment - Judgment on the Pleading - 03/09/2021 entered for Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company against Defendant Guillermo Ledezman Jr..: Result: Clerical Correction; Result Date: 04/05/2021; Name Extension: - Judgment on the Pleading - 03/09/2021 entered for Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company against Defendant Guillermo Ledezman Jr.. As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment on the Pleading: Status Date changed from 03/22/2021 to 04/05/2021; Result Date changed from 03/22/2021 to 04/05/2021; As To Parties changed from Guillermo Ledezman, Jr. (Defendant) to Guillermo Ledezman, Jr. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment on the Pleading: As To Parties changed from Guillermo Ledezman, Jr. (Defendant) to Guillermo Ledezman, Jr. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 04/05/2021 ; Costs: 658.35 ; Status Date changed from 03/09/2021 to 04/05/2021 ; Costs TBD: blank ; Status changed from Entered to Interlineated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketJudgment on the Pleading; Signed and Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Guillermo Ledezman, Jr. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketDeclaration RE INTEREST; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Guillermo Ledezman, Jr. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Guillermo Ledezman, Jr. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Guillermo Ledezman, Jr. (Defendant); Total Costs: 658.35

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Application for Order to Publish for Guillermo: As To Parties changed from Guillermo Ledezman, Jr. (Defendant) to Guillermo Ledezman, Jr. (Defendant); Status changed from Rejected to Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketDeclaration OF KYLE CREASEY IN SUPPORT OF ORDER PERMITTING SERVICE BY PUBLICATION; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketDeclaration OF BREANNE L REESE ESQ IN SUPPORT OF ORDER PERMITTING SERVICE BY PUBLICATION; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/23/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Guillermo Ledezman, Jr. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STLC12124    Hearing Date: March 02, 2020    Dept: 26

State Farm v. Ledezman, Jr., et al.

MOTION TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION ADMITTED

(CCP § 2033.280)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company’s Motion to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted Against Defendant Guillermo Ledezman, Jr. is GRANTED. DEFENDNT IS TO PAY SANCTIONS OF $260.00 TO PLAINTIFF’S COUNSEL WITHIN 30 DAYS’ NOTICE OF THIS ORDER.

ANALYSIS:

On October 19, 2019, Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (“Plaintiff”) served Requests for Admissions on Defendant Guillermo Ledezman, Jr. (“Defendant”). (Motion, Reese Decl., Exh. A.) On December 17, 2019, Defendant served unverified responses to the Requests for Admission. (Id. at Exh. B.) Despite providing Defendant with an extension of the time to serve verified responses, to date, Plaintiff has not received verified responses to the discovery requests propounded on Defendant. (Id. at p. 2:1-3.) As a result, Plaintiff filed the instant Motion to Deem the Truth of Matters Specified in Requests for Admissions Admitted and Request for Monetary Sanctions (the “Motion”) on February 3 31, 2020. To date, no opposition has been filed.

Defendant has not provided verified responses to the discovery propounded by Plaintiff nor filed an opposition to the motion. There is no requirement for a prior meet and confer effort before a motion to deem requests for admission can be filed. Further, the motion can be brought any time after the responding party fails to provide the responses.

The Court finds the failure to respond a misuse of the discovery process. Sanctions are appropriate under Code of Civil Procedure sections 2023.010, 2023.030 and 2033.280, and have been properly noticed. Sanctions are granted against Defendant in the amount of $260.00, based on one hour of attorney time billed at $200.00 per hour, plus the $60.00 filing fee. (Id. at p. 2:4-7.)

Based on the foregoing, Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company’s Motion to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted Against Defendant Guillermo Ledezman, Jr. is GRANTED. DEFENDNT IS TO PAY SANCTIONS OF $260.00 TO PLAINTIFF’S COUNSEL WITHIN 30 DAYS’ NOTICE OF THIS ORDER.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties may submit via e mail until Monday at 10 a.m.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VELLA LOUIS J. ESQ.