This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/09/2021 at 04:41:02 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS GREGORY SEANDEL BAINES

Case Summary

On 04/16/2019 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GREGORY SEANDEL BAINES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3721

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants and Not Classified By Court

BAINES GREGORY SEANDEL

LOYA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

LOYA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY DISMISSED

Interpleader, Defendant and Not Classified By Court

LOYA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BENSON SUSAN M

BENSON SUSAN MARY

Defendant, Interpleader and Not Classified By Court Attorney

KABIR ROSE

 

Court Documents

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

9/9/2021: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) as to Interven...)

9/2/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) as to Interven...)

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

9/2/2021: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort - Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort

8/18/2021: Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort - Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/3/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

8/3/2021: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration Re: Superior Court Filing Cal. Civ. Code Section 1033

8/3/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration Re: Superior Court Filing Cal. Civ. Code Section 1033

Minute Order - Minute Order (Jury Trial;)

8/2/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Jury Trial;)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Jury Trial;) of 08/02/2021

8/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Jury Trial;) of 08/02/2021

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/15/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

7/15/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

7/29/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to Intervene

2/21/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to Intervene

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/16/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Motion for Leave to Intervene - Motion for Leave to Intervene

7/22/2020: Motion for Leave to Intervene - Motion for Leave to Intervene

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 09/04/2020

9/4/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 09/04/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

9/4/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

4/16/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Gregory Seandel Baines (Defendant); Partial Amount: 4282.33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Gregory Seandel Baines (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company against Defendant Gregory Seandel Baines on the Complaint filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on 04/16/2019 for the principal amount of $9,488.95, interest of $1,601.60, and costs of $300.50 for a total of $11,391.05.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) as to Interven...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) as to Intervenor, Loya Casualty Insurance Company, Only scheduled for 09/02/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 09/02/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default and Default Judgment as to Gregory Seandel Baines scheduled for 09/02/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 09/02/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: Name Extension: blank; As To Parties changed from Loya Casualty Insurance Company (Defendant in Intervention) to Loya Casualty Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Loya Casualty Insurance Company (Defendant in Intervention): Organization Name changed from Loya Casualty Insurance Company (DISMISSED) to Loya Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal (as to Does 1 through 5): Name Extension: (as to Does 1 through 5); As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with prejudice as to Defendant In Intervention Loya Casualty Insurance ONLY; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Loya Casualty Insurance Company (Defendant in Intervention)

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Leave to Intervene scheduled for 03/17/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Gregory Seandel Baines (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/13/2019; Service Cost: 75.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/13/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Gregory Seandel Baines (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Gregory Seandel Baines (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Gregory Seandel Baines (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC03721    Hearing Date: September 02, 2020    Dept: 26

MOTION TO INTERVENE

(CCP § 387) 

TENTATIVE RULING:

Proposed Intervenor Loya Casualty Insurance Company’s Motion to Intervene is GRANTED.

ANALYSIS:

On April 16, 2019, Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (“Plaintiff”) filed the instant action for automobile subrogation against Defendant Gregory Seandel Baines (“Defendant”). Plaintiff filed a proof of service of the Summons and Complaint demonstrating that Defendant was served with this action on May 11, 2019. To date, Defendant has not filed a responsive pleading. Non-party Loya Casualty Insurance Company (“Loya Casualty”) filed the instant motion to intervene on February 21, 2020.

The Motion was set for hearing on March 17, 2020, then continued prior to hearing to September 2, 2020. On July 22, 2020, Loya Casualty re-filed the Motion with an amended supporting declaration.

To date, no opposition has been filed.

Discussion

The right to intervene is set forth at Code of Civil Procedure section 387. Intervention is allowed when “[t]he person seeking intervention claims an interest relating to the property or transaction that is the subject of the action and that person is so situated that the disposition of the action may impair or impede that person's ability to protect that interest, unless that person's interest is adequately represented by one or more of the existing parties.” (Code Civ. Proc., § 387, subd. (d)(1)(B).) Whether the petitioner has an interest in the matter in litigation is a question of fact that must be determined by the court before leave to file is granted.  (Muller v. Robinson (1959) 174 Cal.App.2d 511, 515; In re Yokohama Special Bank (1948) 86 Cal.App.2d 545.) The burden rests on the one seeking to intervene to show that this is a proper case for intervention. (Id. at 515.) 

Loya Casualty presents evidence it was Defendant’s insurer at the time of the accident that gives rise to this action. (Motion, First Amended Kabir Decl., ¶3 and Exh. A.) Loya Casualty further presents evidence that it has been unable to locate Defendant to participate in this action. (Motion, Kabir Decl., ¶¶5-7.) It is undisputed that Defendant has not appeared and that his insurer would have an interest as it would be required to satisfy any judgment rendered against Defendant. (See Cal. Ins. Code § 11580, subd. (b)(2); Reliance Ins. Co. v. Superior Court (2000) 84 Cal.App.4th 383, 386.) Nor would intervention enlarge the issues in this action, as it would simply assert defenses on Defendant’s behalf. (Reliance Ins. Co., supra at 386 (citing Truck Ins. Exch. v. Superior Court (1997) 60 Cal.App.4th 342, 346).)

Based on the foregoing, Proposed Intervenor Loya Casualty Insurance Company’s Motion to Intervene is GRANTED. 

Moving party to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOYA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KABIR, ROSE