This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/02/2021 at 01:13:09 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS GREGORY BOISSONNAULT

Case Summary

On 12/19/2019 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GREGORY BOISSONNAULT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1572

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

BOISSONNAULT GREGORY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHOECK MICHAEL D.

Defendant Attorney

HUMMEL BRIAN G.

 

Court Documents

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF TRISTAN P ESPINOSA ISO MOTION TO DEEM RFA'S ADMITTED

9/1/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF TRISTAN P ESPINOSA ISO MOTION TO DEEM RFA'S ADMITTED

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/1/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

9/1/2020: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted - Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

9/1/2020: Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted - Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/20/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Electronic Proof of Service

5/26/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Electronic Proof of Service

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order TO CONTINUE TRIAL

5/28/2021: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

3/23/2020: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Answer - Answer

3/23/2020: Answer - Answer

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF VENUE

12/19/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF VENUE

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/19/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

12/19/2019: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

12/19/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/19/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2022
  • Hearing12/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • Hearing01/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order TO CONTINUE TRIAL; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: GREGORY BOISSONNAULT (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 01/27/2022 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketElectronic Proof of Service; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: GREGORY BOISSONNAULT (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: GREGORY BOISSONNAULT (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted scheduled for 01/20/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 12/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketMotion to Deem RFA's Admitted; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: GREGORY BOISSONNAULT (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: GREGORY BOISSONNAULT (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketDeclaration OF TRISTAN P ESPINOSA ISO MOTION TO DEEM RFA'S ADMITTED; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: GREGORY BOISSONNAULT (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: GREGORY BOISSONNAULT (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketDeclaration DECLARATION OF VENUE; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: GREGORY BOISSONNAULT (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: GREGORY BOISSONNAULT (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: GREGORY BOISSONNAULT (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC11572    Hearing Date: January 20, 2021    Dept: 26

State Farm v. Boissonnault, et al.MOTION TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION ADMITTED(CCP § 2033.280) *PARTIES MUST NOTIFY THE COURT BY 3PM TODAY VIA PHONE OR E MAIL IF THEY WISH TO SUBMIT.

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company’s Motion to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted Against Defendant Gregory Boissonnault is GRANTED. DEFENDANT IS TO PAY SANCTIONS OF $460.00 TO PLAINTIFF’S COUNSEL WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER.

ANALYSIS:

On April 27, 2020, Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (“Plaintiff”) served Requests for Admissions on Defendant Gregory Boissonnault (“Defendant”). (Motion, Espinosa Decl., Exh. 1.) Despite providing Defendant an extension of the time to serve responses, as of the filing of this Motion, Plaintiff had not received any verified responses to the discovery requests propounded on Defendant. (Id. at ¶¶2-6 and Exh. B.) As a result, Plaintiff filed the instant Motion to Deem the Truth of Matters Specified in Requests for Admissions to Defendant as Admitted and for Monetary Sanctions (the “Motion”) on September 1, 2020.

To date, no opposition has been filed.

Discussion

According to Plaintiff, Defendant had not provided verified responses to the discovery propounded by Plaintiff on April 27, 2020 as of the filing of the Motion. There is no requirement for a prior meet and confer effort before a motion to deem requests for admission can be filed. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2033.280.) Further, the motion can be brought any time after the responding party fails to provide the responses. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2033.280.)

Therefore, Plaintiff is entitled to an order deeming the Requests for Admission admitted. Sanctions are required under Code of Civil Procedure sections 2023.010, 2023.030 and 2033.280, and have been properly noticed. Sanctions are granted against Defendant in the amount of $460.00, based on two hours of attorney time billed at $200.00 per hour, plus the $60.00 filing fee. (Id. at ¶7.)

Based on the foregoing, Plaintiff’s Motion to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted Against Defendant Gregory Boissonnault is GRANTED. DEFENDANT IS TO PAY SANCTIONS OF $460.00 TO PLAINTIFF’S COUNSEL WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER.

Moving party to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHOECK MICHAEL D