This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/08/2021 at 09:20:28 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS GABRIEL AYON

Case Summary

On 11/05/2019 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GABRIEL AYON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0219

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

AYON GABRIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHOECK MICHAEL D.

Defendant Attorneys

FAAL ALI

MORALES EDWARD J.

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - Notice OF HEARING - AMENDED RE MOTION TO DEEM

7/8/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice OF HEARING - AMENDED RE MOTION TO DEEM

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/8/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

5/19/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures - Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures

9/18/2020: Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures - Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures

Answer - Answer

9/18/2020: Answer - Answer

Order (name extension) - Order ON REQUEST TO OPT OUT OF MANDATORY EXPEDITED JURY TRIAL PROCEDURES

9/25/2020: Order (name extension) - Order ON REQUEST TO OPT OUT OF MANDATORY EXPEDITED JURY TRIAL PROCEDURES

Association of Attorney - Association of Attorney

3/30/2021: Association of Attorney - Association of Attorney

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/7/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Trial Brief - Trial Brief

4/7/2021: Trial Brief - Trial Brief

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/7/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Motion in Limine (name extension) - Motion in Limine NO 1 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE, WITNESSES AND CONTENTIONS NOT DISCLOSED IN DISCOVERY

4/7/2021: Motion in Limine (name extension) - Motion in Limine NO 1 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE, WITNESSES AND CONTENTIONS NOT DISCLOSED IN DISCOVERY

Motion in Limine (name extension) - Motion in Limine NO 2 TO EXCLUDE FINANCIAL CONDITION OF DEFENDANT

4/7/2021: Motion in Limine (name extension) - Motion in Limine NO 2 TO EXCLUDE FINANCIAL CONDITION OF DEFENDANT

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/7/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order by all Parties to Continue Trial and All Related Dates

4/12/2021: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order by all Parties to Continue Trial and All Related Dates

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/5/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF VENUE

11/5/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF VENUE

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/5/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

11/5/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2022
  • Hearing11/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • Hearing02/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted scheduled for 08/03/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 07/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketNotice OF HEARING - AMENDED RE MOTION TO DEEM; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: GABRIEL AYON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: GABRIEL AYON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted scheduled for 07/06/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 08/03/2021 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted scheduled for 07/06/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketMotion to Deem RFA's Admitted; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: GABRIEL AYON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: GABRIEL AYON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketDeclaration DECLARATION OF VENUE; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: GABRIEL AYON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: GABRIEL AYON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: GABRIEL AYON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: GABRIEL AYON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

b"

Case Number: 19STLC10219 Hearing Date: July 6, 2021 Dept: 26

Due to Court's unavailability, Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted previously set on 07/06/2021 has been reset to 08/03/2021 at 10:00 a.m."

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHOECK MICHAEL D