This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/21/2021 at 03:09:22 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS FATAI OLUMIDE OLANIYI, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/07/2020 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FATAI OLUMIDE OLANIYI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0128

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

RASAQ SALAAM

OLANIYI FATAI OLUMIDE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHOECK MICHAEL D.

Defendant Attorney

KENT EDWARD SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF BREANNE L REESE ESQ ISO MOTION TO DEEM ADMISSIONS

7/27/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF BREANNE L REESE ESQ ISO MOTION TO DEEM ADMISSIONS

Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted - Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

7/27/2020: Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted - Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/27/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

7/27/2020: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted)

1/11/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted) of 01/11/2021

1/11/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted) of 01/11/2021

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

4/1/2021: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/1/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/11/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order TO CONTINUE TRIAL

5/12/2021: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Answer - Answer

2/18/2020: Answer - Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/6/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/7/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/7/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

1/7/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF VENUE

1/7/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF VENUE

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/7/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

1/7/2020: Complaint - Complaint

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2023
  • Hearing01/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • Hearing01/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order TO CONTINUE TRIAL; Signed and Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: FATAI OLUMIDE OLANIYI (Defendant); SALAAM RASAQ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/06/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 01/31/2022 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: FATAI OLUMIDE OLANIYI (Defendant); SALAAM RASAQ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: FATAI OLUMIDE OLANIYI (Defendant); SALAAM RASAQ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted scheduled for 02/25/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 02/25/2021; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted scheduled for 02/25/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: FATAI OLUMIDE OLANIYI (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/28/2020; Service Cost: 79.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/06/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: FATAI OLUMIDE OLANIYI (Defendant); SALAAM RASAQ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: FATAI OLUMIDE OLANIYI (Defendant); SALAAM RASAQ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: FATAI OLUMIDE OLANIYI (Defendant); SALAAM RASAQ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketDeclaration DECLARATION OF VENUE; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: FATAI OLUMIDE OLANIYI (Defendant); SALAAM RASAQ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STLC00128    Hearing Date: February 25, 2021    Dept: 25


Case Number: 20STLC05433    Hearing Date: February 25, 2021    Dept: 25

HEARING DATE: Thu., February 25, 2021 JUDGE /DEPT: Blancarte/25

CASE NAME: Koury v. Freedom Forever, LLC, et al. COMPL. FILED: 06-29-20

CASE NUMBER: 20STLC05433 DISC. C/O: 11-27-21

NOTICE: OK DISC. MOT. C/O: 12-12-21

TRIAL DATE: 12-27-21

PROCEEDINGS: DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF’S COMPLAINT

MOVING PARTY: Defendants Freedom Forever, LLC and Freedom Forever California, LLC

RESP. PARTY: None

DEMURRER

(CCP § 430.10, et seq.)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Because Plaintiff has filed a First Amended Complaint, Defendants Freedom Forever, LLC and Freedom Forever California, LLC’s Demurrer to Plaintiff’s Complaint is PLACED OFF CALENDAR AS MOOT.

SERVICE:

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

OPPOSITION: None filed as of February 23, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of February 23, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background & Discussion

On June 29, 2020, self-represented Plaintiff Ken Koury (“Plaintiff”) filed a complaint against Defendants Freedom Forever, LLC and Freedom Forever California, LLC (collectively, “Defendants”).

Defendants filed the instant Demurrer to Plaintiff’s Complaint (the “Demurrer”) on July 31, 2020. No opposition was filed.

On February 22, 2021 Plaintiff filed a First Amended Complaint (the “FAC”). Thus, the instant Demurrer is MOOT. (Barton v. Khan (2007) 157 Cal.App.4th 1216, 1221 [finding that pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 472, “a plaintiff has a right to amend his or her pleading at any time before a responsive pleading is filed and even after a responsive pleading is filed up to the time of the hearing on the demurrer”].) Accordingly, the Demurrer is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

  1. Conclusion & Order

Because Plaintiff has filed a First Amended Complaint, Defendants Freedom Forever, LLC and Freedom Forever California, LLC’s Demurrer to Plaintiff’s Complaint is PLACED OFF CALENDAR AS MOOT.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHOECK MICHAEL D