Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 09:03:53 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS EVELYN TORRES

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against EVELYN TORRES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1549

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

TORRES EVELYN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PILLEMER DAVID BERNARD

Defendant Attorney

COLMAN JONATHAN HILLEL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

1/25/2019: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

Proof of Personal Service

10/10/2017: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

10/16/2017: Answer

Summons - on Complaint

9/14/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/14/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/14/2017: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/14/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2020
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/14/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Evelyn Torres (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Evelyn Torres (Defendant); Service Date: 09/27/2017; Service Cost: 65.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Evelyn Torres (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine Lu in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/14/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketOSC - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/17/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 17STLC01549    Hearing Date: July 08, 2020    Dept: 26

State Farm v. Torres, et al.

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

(CCP § 284(2); CRC Rule 3.1362)

TENTATIVE RULING

Attorney Matthew E. Hess, Esq.’s Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant Evelyn Torres is GRANTED. PROPOSED ORDERS HAVE BEEN SUBMITTED. THIS RULING TO BE EFFECTIVE UPON FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SIGNED ORDERS UPON ALL PARTIES.

Moving party to give notice to client and all parties.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PILLEMER DAVID B.