This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/12/2021 at 00:49:11 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS ERNESTO PEREZ

Case Summary

On 02/27/2020 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ERNESTO PEREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1952

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

PEREZ ERNESTO AKA ERNESTO AREANO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GENCHEL ROBIN F

Defendant Attorney

DACEY JENNIFER M.

 

Court Documents

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

7/7/2020: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Answer - Answer

7/7/2020: Answer - Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/19/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice (name extension) - Notice to Defendant to Appear at Trial in Lieu of Subpoena

3/19/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice to Defendant to Appear at Trial in Lieu of Subpoena

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order Stipulation to Continue Trial Date, and all Related Discovery Motion Cut off Dates; Proposed Order

7/23/2021: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order Stipulation to Continue Trial Date, and all Related Discovery Motion Cut off Dates; Proposed Order

Notice (name extension) - Notice to Defendant to Appear at Trial in Lieu of Subpoena

8/2/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice to Defendant to Appear at Trial in Lieu of Subpoena

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Order

8/3/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Order

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/12/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

2/27/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Complaint - Complaint

2/27/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/27/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/27/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/27/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2021
  • Hearing12/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: ERNESTO PEREZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketNotice to Defendant to Appear at Trial in Lieu of Subpoena; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: ERNESTO PEREZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 08/26/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Type changed from Non-Jury Trial to Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Jury Trial scheduled for 08/26/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Party was rescheduled to 12/13/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketNotice to Defendant to Appear at Trial in Lieu of Subpoena; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: ERNESTO PEREZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: ERNESTO PEREZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: ERNESTO PEREZ (Defendant); As to: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: ERNESTO PEREZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: ERNESTO PEREZ (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/28/2020; Service Cost: 70.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/26/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: ERNESTO PEREZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: ERNESTO PEREZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: ERNESTO PEREZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STLC01952    Hearing Date: November 18, 2020    Dept: 25

HEARING DATE: Wed., November 18, 2020 JUDGE /DEPT: Blancarte/25

CASE NAME: Dardashti v. Zanna PET. FILED: 06-19-20

CASE NUMBER: 20STCP01952

NOTICE: NO (continued hearing)

PROCEEDINGS: PETITION FOR RELEASE OF PROPERTY FROM MECHANIC’S LIEN

MOVING PARTY: Petitioner Soheil Dardashti, in pro per

RESP. PARTY: None

PETITION TO RELEASE MECHANIC’S LIEN

(Civ. Code § 8480, et seq.)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Petitioner Soheil Dardashti’s Petition for Release from Mechanic’s Lien is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

SERVICE:

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

[ ] At least 15 Days Lapsed (Civ. Code § 8486(b)) NO

[ ] Correct Manner of Service (Civ. Code § 8486(b)) NO

OPPOSITION: None filed as of November 13, 2020 [ ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of November 13, 2020 [ ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background & Discussion

On June 19, 2020, Petitioner Soheil Dardashti (“Petitioner”) filed the instant Petition for Release of Property from Mechanic’s Lien (the “Petition”) against Respondent Nissim Nick Zanna (“Respondent”). Petitioner seeks to release his property located at 12980 San Vicente Blvd., Los Angeles, CA 90049 (the “Property”) from a mechanic’s lien. (Pet., ¶ 1.)

At the initial October 23, 2020, the Court found Petitioner had not satisfied the service requirements of Civil Code section 8486 or the petition requirements of Civil Code sections 8482 and 8484. (10/23/20 Minute Order.) The Court continued the hearing and ordered Petitioner to file supplemental papers addressing the noted defects at least 16 court days before the next scheduled hearing. (Id.) Petitioner was cautioned that failure to do so could result in the Petition being placed off calendar or denied. (Id.)

To date, no supplemental papers have been filed. Accordingly, the Petition is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Petitioner Soheil Dardashti’s Petition for Release from Mechanic’s Lien is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

Petitioner is ordered to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GENCHEL ROBIN F