Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/12/2021 at 00:39:06 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS DYLAN LEE GENE SAMPSEL

Case Summary

On 04/02/2019 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DYLAN LEE GENE SAMPSEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3151

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

SAMPSEL DYLAN LEE GENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHOECK MICHAEL D

Defendant Attorney

SMITH-MARS DENISE A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2021
  • Hearing07/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted: Filed By: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); Result: Granted in Part; Result Date: 03/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted scheduled for 03/10/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 03/10/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketReply TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DEEM RFA'S ADMITTED; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketDeclaration OF BREANNE L REESE ESQ ISO REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DEEM RFA'S ADMITTED; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) DECLARATION OF SERVICE; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: DYLAN LEE GENE SAMPSEL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketOpposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Deem Matter's Admitted and Request for Sanctions; Declaration of Rajeev S. Patel; Filed by: DYLAN LEE GENE SAMPSEL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted scheduled for 03/10/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketMotion to Deem RFA's Admitted; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: DYLAN LEE GENE SAMPSEL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketAffidavit AFFIDAVIT'OF MERIT; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/29/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: DYLAN LEE GENE SAMPSEL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: DYLAN LEE GENE SAMPSEL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: DYLAN LEE GENE SAMPSEL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketDeclaration DECLARATION OF VENUE; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: DYLAN LEE GENE SAMPSEL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC03151    Hearing Date: March 10, 2021    Dept: 26

State Farm v. Sampsel., et al.

MOTION TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION ADMITTED

(CCP § 2033.280)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company’s Motion to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted Against Defendant Dylan Lee Gene Sampsel and Request for Sanctions is DENIED AS TO REQUEST NOS. 2-9 AND GRANTED AS TO REQUEST NO. 1. THE REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IS GRANTED.

ANALYSIS:

Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (“Plaintiff”) served Requests for Admissions on Defendant Dylan Lee Gene Samsel (“Defendant”) on March 20, 2020. (Motion, Reese Decl., Exh. A.) Following multiple extensions of the time to respond, Defendant served unverified responses on June 24, 2020. (Id. at ¶¶5-6.) Plaintiff’s counsel sought to meet and confer again but, to date, no verified responses have been served. (Id. at ¶7-8 and Exh. B.)

Plaintiff filed the instant Motion to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted and Request for Sanctions on January 15, 2021. Defendant filed an opposition on February 25, 2021 and Plaintiff replied on March 3, 2021.

Discussion

Plaintiff moves pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 2033.280, which mandates that “[i]f a party to whom requests for admission are directed fails to serve a timely response” the propounding party may move for an “order that the genuineness of any documents and the truth of any matters specified in the requests be deemed admitted.” (Code Civ. Proc., § 2033.280, subd. (b).) The Court must enter the order unless “the party to whom the requests for admission have been directed has served, before the hearing on the motion, a proposed response to the requests for admission that is in substantial compliance with Section 2033.220.” (Code Civ. Proc., § 2033.280, subd. (c).)

Plaintiff contends that the responses served on June 24, 2020 were unverified and tantamount to no response at all. (Citing Appleton v. Superior Court (1988) 206 Cal.App.3d 632, 636.) Defendant argues in opposition that response Nos. 2-9 were “hybrid” or full objection responses for which the objection portion need not be verified. Responses Nos. 2-9 served by Defendant were in fact hybrid responses; only response No. 1 was an unverified admission. (Opp., Patel Decl., Exh. A.)

“Hybrid” responses, which contain both an objection and fact-based statement, do not need a verification as to the objection portion. (Food 4 Less Supermarkets, Inc. v. Superior Court (1995) 40 Cal.App.4th 651, 657-658.) Similarly, a response that contains only objections does not need a verification. (Id. at 656; Code Civ. Proc., § 2033.240, subd. (a).) While the factual statements in the responses are essentially non-responses because they are not verified, the objections are valid responses and require no verification. Therefore, Defendant did timely serve responses to Requests for Admission, Nos. 2-9. Only the response to Request No. 1 was “tantamount to no response at all.” (Appleton, supra, 206 Cal.App.3d 636.)

Therefore, Plaintiff is entitled to an order deeming the Requests for Admission admitted as to Request No. 1. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2033.280.) Additionally, sanctions are required under Code of Civil Procedure sections 2033.280, and have been properly noticed against Defendant Dylan Gene Sampsel in the amount of $460. (Motion, Reese Decl., ¶¶9-11.)

Based on the foregoing, Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company’s Motion to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted and Request for Sanctions Against Defendant Dylan Lee Gene Sampsel is DENIED AS TO REQUEST NOS. 2-9 AND GRANTED AS TO REQUEST NO. 1. THE REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IS GRANTED which are to be paid within 30 days of service of this order to Plaintiff.

Plaintiff to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHOECK MICHAEL D