This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/25/2021 at 00:06:06 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS DAVID OJEDA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/24/2020 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DAVID OJEDA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0750

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

LARGO CONCRETE INC.

MORALES MATTHEW DBA SOUTHLAND TRUCKS INC.

OJEDA DAVID

WALTON CONSTRUCTION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHOECK MICHAEL D.

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Complaint

1/24/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/24/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/24/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/24/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF VENUE

1/24/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF VENUE

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

1/24/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/13/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/13/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473))

4/14/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473))

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

2/16/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/16/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal - Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal

2/16/2021: Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal - Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF CHRISTOPHER BEYER ESQ ISO MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL

2/16/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF CHRISTOPHER BEYER ESQ ISO MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/20/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

7/20/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal: Filed By: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); Result: Denied; Result Date: 04/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473) scheduled for 04/14/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 04/14/2021; Result Type to Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketMotion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketDeclaration OF CHRISTOPHER BEYER ESQ ISO MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: DAVID OJEDA (Defendant); MATTHEW MORALES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473) scheduled for 04/14/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/23/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: LARGO CONCRETE, INC. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/06/2020; Service Cost: 79.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: DAVID OJEDA (Defendant); MATTHEW MORALES (Defendant); LARGO CONCRETE, INC. (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketDeclaration DECLARATION OF VENUE; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: DAVID OJEDA (Defendant); MATTHEW MORALES (Defendant); LARGO CONCRETE, INC. (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: DAVID OJEDA (Defendant); MATTHEW MORALES (Defendant); LARGO CONCRETE, INC. (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: DAVID OJEDA (Defendant); MATTHEW MORALES (Defendant); LARGO CONCRETE, INC. (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/23/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STLC00750    Hearing Date: April 14, 2021    Dept: 25

HEARING DATE: Wed., April 14, 2021 JUDGE /DEPT: Blancarte/25

CASE NAME: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. v. Ojeda, et al.

CASE NUMBER: 20STLC00750 COMPL. FILED: 01-24-20

NOTICE: OK DISMISSAL: 07-23-20

PROCEEDINGS: MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

RESP. PARTY: None

MOTION TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL

(CCP § 473(b))

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company’s Motion to Vacate Dismissal is DENIED.

SERVICE:

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

OPPOSITION: None filed as of April 12, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of April 12, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background

On January 24, 2020, Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (“Plaintiff”) filed a Complaint against David Ojeda (“Ojeda”), Matthew Morales dba Southland Trucks, Inc. (“Morales”), Largo Concrete, Inc. (“Largo”), and Walton Construction, Inc. (“Walton”) (collectively, “Defendants”).

Plaintiff filed a request for dismissal of the entire action and of all parties with prejudice on July 20, 2020. The Court granted Plaintiff’s request on July 23, 2020 and dismissed the entire action with prejudice.

On February 16, 2021, Plaintiff filed the instant Motion to Vacate Dismissal (the “Motion”). No opposition was filed.

  1. Legal Standard & Discussion

Plaintiff seeks relief pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 473, subdivision (b). (Mot., MP&A, p. 2.) Under this statute, an application for relief must be made no more than six months after entry of the judgment, dismissal, order, or other proceeding from which relief is sought and must be accompanied by an affidavit of fault attesting to the mistake, inadvertence, surprise or neglect of the moving party or its attorney. (Code Civ. Proc., § 473, subd. (b); English v. IKON Business Solutions (2001) 94 Cal.App.4th 130, 143.)

Plaintiff seeks to set aside the dismissal entered on July 23, 2020 due to Plaintiff’s counsel’s mistake. (Mot., MP&A p. 2.) Specifically, counsel states he mistakenly filed a request for dismissal of the entire action when he only intended to dismiss Defendant Largo and Defendant Walton. (Id., Beyer Decl., ¶ 4.)

The Motion, however, is untimely. Specifically, the dismissal was entered on July 23, 2020, so any motion brought pursuant to Section 473, subdivision (b), had to be filed no later than January 23, 2021. As this Motion was filed on February 16, 2021, it is untimely. Thus, the Court must DENY Plaintiff’s request.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company’s Motion to Vacate Dismissal is DENIED.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LARGO CONCRETE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHOECK MICHAEL D