This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/15/2021 at 00:42:20 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS COLBY GRAY SELIGMAN

Case Summary

On 04/30/2020 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against COLBY GRAY SELIGMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3715

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

SELIGMAN COLBY GRAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STRUMWASSER GREGG

Defendant Attorney

KIM CHRISTINA E.

 

Court Documents

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

6/28/2021: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

6/28/2021: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Notice (name extension) - Notice to Appear at Trial in Lieu of Subpoena

9/1/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice to Appear at Trial in Lieu of Subpoena

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance C...)

9/7/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance C...)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance C...) of 09/07/2021

9/7/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance C...) of 09/07/2021

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

9/29/2021: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

10/22/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Order (name extension) - Order on Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures

7/17/2020: Order (name extension) - Order on Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/2/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

5/29/2020: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures - Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures

5/29/2020: Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures - Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/29/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer - Answer

5/29/2020: Answer - Answer

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

5/26/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

4/30/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [First Amended Standing Order, Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case]

5/18/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [First Amended Standing Order, Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case]

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

4/30/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Complaint - Complaint

4/30/2020: Complaint - Complaint

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2021
  • Hearing12/15/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: (name extension)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal After Notice of Conditional Settlement filed on 09/29/2021 scheduled for 12/15/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 10/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 09/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No; Settlement Type: Unconditional; Set Hearing and Generate Notice?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion: Filed By: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); Result: Denied; Result Date: 09/07/2021; As To Parties changed from COLBY GRAY SELIGMAN (Defendant) to COLBY GRAY SELIGMAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion: Filed By: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); Result: Denied; Result Date: 09/07/2021; As To Parties changed from COLBY GRAY SELIGMAN (Defendant) to COLBY GRAY SELIGMAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance C...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance C...) of 09/07/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 09/07/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 09/07/2021; Result Type to Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [First Amended Standing Order, Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- First Amended Standing Order: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: COLBY GRAY SELIGMAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: COLBY GRAY SELIGMAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: COLBY GRAY SELIGMAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: 20STLC03715 Hearing Date: September 7, 2021 Dept: 26

State Farm v. Seligman,\r\net al. 20STLC03715

MOTION TO\r\nCOMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION; REQUEST FOR\r\nSANCTIONS

\r\n\r\n

(CCP §§ 2030.290, 2031.300)

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

TENTATIVE RULING:

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company’s\r\n(1) Motion To Compel Responses To Form Interrogatories and Request for\r\nSanctions; and (2) Motion To Compel Responses To Demand For Production Of\r\nDocuments and Request for Sanctions are DENIED.

ANALYSIS:

Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company\r\n(“Plaintiff”) propounded Form Interrogatories and Requests for Production of\r\nDocuments on Defendant Colby Gray Seligman (“Defendant”) on June 23, 2020.\r\n(Motions, Strumwasser Decl., Exh. A.) After Defendant served unverified\r\nresponses, Plaintiff’s counsel sent a meet and confer letter on June 7, 2021. (Id.\r\nat Exh. B.) Following no response to the meet and confer letter, Plaintiff\r\nfiled the instant (1) Motion To Compel Responses To Form Interrogatories, Set\r\nOne and Request for Sanctions; and (2) Motion To Compel Responses To Demand For\r\nProduction Of Documents and Request for Sanctions on June 28, 2021. (Id.\r\nat ¶5.)

By Plaintiff’s own account, Defendant served unverified\r\nresponses to the discovery. However, the responses are not attached to the\r\nMotions and Plaintiff does not offer evidence regarding when the unverified\r\nresponses were served. If the unverified responses were timely served and\r\ncontained objections, there is no basis to compel responses. (See Code Civ.\r\nProc., §§ 2030.250, subd. (a); 2031.250, subd. (a); Food 4 Less Supermarkets, Inc. v. Superior Court (1995) 40 Cal.App.4th 651, 657-658.)\r\nTherefore, Plaintiff has not provided the Court with sufficient evidence\r\nto demonstrate it is entitled to an order compelling responses to the Form\r\nInterrogatories and Requests for Production.

Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company’s\r\n(1) Motion To Compel Responses To Form Interrogatories and Request for\r\nSanctions; and (2) Motion To Compel Responses To Demand For Production Of\r\nDocuments and Request for Sanctions are DENIED.

\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n

Court clerk to give notice.

'
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STRUMWASSER, GREGG