Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/02/2020 at 05:58:57 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS ARTSRUN STEPANYAN

Case Summary

On 06/03/2020 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ARTSRUN STEPANYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4678

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

STEPANYAN ARTSRUN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PLEASANT JOSEPH M.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

6/25/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/3/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/3/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF VENUE

6/3/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF VENUE

Complaint - Complaint

6/3/2020: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

6/3/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/3/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2023
  • Hearing06/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • Hearing12/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: ARTSRUN STEPANYAN (Defendant); Service Date: 06/15/2020; Service Cost: 89.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: ARTSRUN STEPANYAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketDeclaration DECLARATION OF VENUE; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: ARTSRUN STEPANYAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: ARTSRUN STEPANYAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: ARTSRUN STEPANYAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less