This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/27/2020 at 01:59:52 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS ARTAK BARAKESYAN

Case Summary

On 12/12/2018 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ARTAK BARAKESYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4890

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

BARAKESYAN ARTAK DBA AB AUTO TRANS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENSON SUSAN MARY

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))

8/25/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

8/26/2020: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

1/17/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

1/17/2020: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/24/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Continued Motion for Order Compelling Responses to Form Interrogatories

3/25/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Continued Motion for Order Compelling Responses to Form Interrogatories

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/29/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/16/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer - Answer

6/14/2019: Answer - Answer

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

12/12/2018: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/12/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

12/12/2018: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/12/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/12/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2021
  • Hearing03/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion: Filed By: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 08/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 08/25/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 08/25/2020; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 03/22/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/15/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketNotice Notice of Continued Motion for Order Compelling Responses to Form Interrogatories; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Artak Barakesyan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Artak Barakesyan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Artak Barakesyan (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/26/2019; Service Cost: 75.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Artak Barakesyan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Artak Barakesyan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Artak Barakesyan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STLC14890    Hearing Date: August 25, 2020    Dept: 26

State Farm v. Barakesyan, et al.

MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES

AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

(CCP § 2030.290)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company’s Motion Compelling Defendant Arak Barakesyan dba AB Auto Trans To Respond to Form Interrogatories, Set One, is GRANTED. VERIFIED RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTION ARE TO BE SERVED WITHIN 20 DAYS’ NOTICE OF THIS ORDER. SANCTIONS ARE GRANTED AGAINST DEFENDANT IN THE AMOUNT OF $360.00, TO BE PAID TO PLAINTIFF’S COUNSEL WITHIN 30 DAYS’ NOTICE OF THIS ORDER.

ANALYSIS:

Only December 12, 2018, Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (“Plaintiff”) filed the instant action for automobile subrogation against Defendant Artak Barakeysan dba AB Auto Trans (“Defendant”). On January 17, 2020, Plaintiff filed the instant Motion to Compel Responses to Form Interrogatories, and Request for Sanctions. To date, no opposition has been filed.

Defendant has not provided any responses to the interrogatories propounded by Plaintiff on October 17, 2019. (Motion, Cicione Decl., ¶¶3-4 and Exh. 1.) There is no requirement for a prior meet and confer effort before a motion to compel initial responses can be filed. Further, the motion can be brought any time after the responding party fails to provide the responses. Based on the foregoing, Plaintiff is entitled to an order that Defendant serve verified responses to the Form Interrogatories, Set One, without objections. The responses are due within 20 days’ notice of this order.

The court also finds Defendant’s failure to respond a misuse of the discovery process. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2023.010, subd. (d).) Sanctions are appropriate under Code of Civil Procedure sections 2023.010 and 2023.030, and have been properly noticed. However, the amount sought is excessive given the simplicity of this unopposed motion. The request for sanctions is granted against Defendant in the amount of $360.00 based on one hour of attorney time billed at $300.00 per hour. (Motion, Cicione Decl., ¶9.) The sanctions are to be paid within 30 days’ notice of this order.

Moving party to give notice.