This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2019 at 13:36:33 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS ANTHONY CASTILLO

Case Summary

On 01/25/2018 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ANTHONY CASTILLO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1664

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

CASTILLO ANTHONY

CASTILLO DANIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PLEASANT JOSEPH M

Defendant Attorneys

DUNKIN CRAIG LEE

KELLY FRANCINE B

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

7/18/2019: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

7/19/2019: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Association of Attorney - Association of Attorney

3/28/2019: Association of Attorney - Association of Attorney

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/27/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

3/27/2018: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/27/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/19/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - of Venue

1/25/2018: Declaration (name extension) - of Venue

Summons - on Complaint

1/25/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/25/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/25/2018: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/25/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause - Hearing (name extension)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date scheduled for 12/10/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date scheduled for 12/10/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date scheduled for 12/10/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 12/10/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 12/10/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/25/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date scheduled for 12/10/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Daniel Castillo (Defendant); Service Cost: 74.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: Name Extension changed from on Complaint to on Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Georgina T. Rizk in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/25/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Anthony Castillo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketDeclaration of Venue; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STLC01664    Hearing Date: February 10, 2021    Dept: 26


Case Number: 19STLC08040    Hearing Date: February 10, 2021    Dept: 26

Alvarez, et al. v. Melendez, et al.

MOTION TO INTERVENE

(CCP § 387)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Proposed Intervenor Loya Casualty Insurance Company’s Motion for Leave to Intervene is GRANTED. RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO COMPLAINT TO BE FILED AND SERVED WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER.

ANALYSIS:

On August 30, 2019, Plaintiffs Melissa Alvarez and minor Michaela Alvarez (“Plaintiffs”) filed the instant action for motor vehicle negligence against Defendants Priscilla Melendez, Evelyn Melendez and Alex Melendez (“Defendants”). Defendants Priscilla and Evelyn filed an Answer on July 13, 2020. To date, no responsive pleading has been filed by Defendant Alex.

On October 1, 2020, non-party Loya Casualty Insurance Company (“Loya Casualty”) served the instant Motion to Intervene on behalf of Defendant Alex. To date, no opposition has been filed.

Discussion

The right to intervene is set forth at Code of Civil Procedure section 387. Intervention is allowed when “[t]he person seeking intervention claims an interest relating to the property or transaction that is the subject of the action and that person is so situated that the disposition of the action may impair or impede that person's ability to protect that interest, unless that person's interest is adequately represented by one or more of the existing parties.” (Code Civ. Proc., § 387, subd. (d)(1)(B).) Whether the petitioner has an interest in the matter in litigation is a question of fact that must be determined by the court before leave to file is granted. (Muller v. Robinson (1959) 174 Cal.App.2d 511, 515; In re Yokohama Special Bank (1948) 86 Cal.App.2d 545.) The burden rests on the one seeking to intervene to show that this is a proper case for intervention. (Id. at 515.)

Loya Casualty demonstrates it was Defendant Alex’s insurer at the time of the accident that gives rise to this action. (Motion, Camacho Decl., Exh. 3.) Loya Casualty further presents evidence that it has been unable to communicate with Defendant Alex to secure his participation in this action. (Id. at ¶¶4-11.) It is undisputed that Defendant Alex’s insurer would have an interest in this action as it would be required to satisfy any judgment rendered against Defendant Alex. (See Cal. Ins. Code § 11580, subd. (b)(2); Reliance Ins. Co. v. Superior Court (2000) 84 Cal.App.4th 383, 386.) Nor would intervention enlarge the issues in this action, as the insurer would simply assert defenses on Defendants’ behalf. (Reliance Ins. Co., supra at 386 (citing Truck Ins. Exch. v. Superior Court (1997) 60 Cal.App.4th 342, 346).)

Based on the foregoing, Proposed Intervenor Loya Casualty Insurance Company’s Motion for Leave to Intervene is GRANTED. RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO COMPLAINT TO BE FILED AND SERVED WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER.

Moving party to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARLAN M. REESE & ASSOCIATES - JOSEPH M. PLEASANT