This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/21/2019 at 04:14:45 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS CO VS HAQQ, AKBAR ABDUL

Case Summary

On 03/16/2017 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS CO filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against HAQQ, AKBAR ABDUL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3231

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS CO

Defendants

HAQQ AKBAR ABDUL

HAQQ AKBAR ABDUL AKA HAQQ AKBAR A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REESE LAW GROUP

 

Court Documents

Other - (name extension) - case summary

12/7/2017: Other - (name extension) - case summary

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

12/7/2017: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/31/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal

12/7/2017: Request for Dismissal

Request for Judicial Notice

12/7/2017: Request for Judicial Notice

Judgment

12/7/2017: Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/4/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/17/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS CO against Defendant HAQQ, AKBAR ABDUL AKA HAQQ, AKBAR A on the Complaint filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS CO on 03/16/2017 for damages of $4,714.14, interest of $4,605.30, and costs of $289.50 for a total of $9,608.94.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS CO (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1-10 only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS CO on 03/16/2017, Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to , Does 1-10 only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS CO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketOther - case summary; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS CO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS CO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • Docket; On the Complaint filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS CO on 03/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS CO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS CO (Plaintiff); As to: AKBAR ABDUL HAQQ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • DocketDefault entered as to AKBAR ABDUL HAQQ; On the Complaint filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS CO on 03/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION OF DILIGENCE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 09/17/18, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT - OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less