This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/10/2021 at 01:36:23 (UTC).

STARKMAN FINANCIAL, ET AL. VS LEE & ASSOCIATES LOS ANGELES WEST, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/01/2020 STARKMAN FINANCIAL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LEE ASSOCIATES LOS ANGELES WEST, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1846

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STARKMAN FINANCIAL

STARKMAN MELVYN

Defendants

1727 BERKELEY LLC

LEE & ASSOCIATES LOS ANGELES WEST INC.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

12/11/2020: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

12/18/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

12/1/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

Attachment - Attachment

12/1/2020: Attachment - Attachment

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Starkman Financial, et al. on 12/01/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Starkman Financial and Melvyn Starkman as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Starkman Financial (Plaintiff); Melvyn Starkman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/08/2021 at 03:00 PM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Starkman Financial (Plaintiff); Melvyn Starkman (Plaintiff); As to: Lee & Associates Los Angeles West, Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 12/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name); Filed by: Starkman Financial (Plaintiff); Melvyn Starkman (Plaintiff); As to: Lee & Associates Los Angeles West, Inc. (Defendant); 1727 Berkeley, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld in Department S Santa Monica Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/08/2021 at 03:00 PM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketAttachment; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearance and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Starkman Financial (Plaintiff); Melvyn Starkman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEE & ASSOCIATES COMMERCIAL REAL ESTATE SERVICES INC.-CITY OF INDUSTRY is a litigant