Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 01:02:18 (UTC).

STAR MANAGEMENT VS SANDOVAL, MANUEL

Case Summary

On 02/19/2015 STAR MANAGEMENT filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SANDOVAL, MANUEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is H. JAY FORD III. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0934

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

H. JAY FORD III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STAR MANAGEMENT

Defendants

SANDOVAL MANUEL

IBANEZ IBETH

HERNANDEZ GEORGE

IBANEZ MANUEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF STEVIN J. SIEBIG - STEVEN J. SIEBIG ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF STEVIN J. SIEBIG

SIEBIG STEVEN J. ESQ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2015
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 145.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 53.33 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # PAID . MAIL SASE...

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • DocketWRIT RECEIVED AS TO (SANDOVAL, MANUEL) , (IBANEZ, IBETH) , (HERNANDEZ, GEORGE) , (IBANEZ, MANUEL) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF (STAR MANAGEMENT) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 10:25A M, IN DEPT. WES , HON. H. JAY FORD III PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. PLAINTIFF(S) APPEARING PAUL WALL, ESQ. (X) . DEFENDANT(S) APPEARING NO APPEARANCES .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • DocketCOURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS : FOR PLAINTIFF STAR MANAGEMENT AND AGAINST DEFENDANTS: MANUEL SANDOVAL, IBETH IBANEZ, GEORGE HERNANDEZ, MANUEL IBAN :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 04/29/15 , FOR (STAR MANAGEMENT) , AGAINST (SANDOVAL, MANUEL) , (IBANEZ, IBETH) , (HERNANDEZ, GEORGE) , (IBANEZ, MANUEL) , PAST DUE RENT $ 2400.00 , DAILY DAMAGES $ 3199.80 , ATTORNEY FEES $ 500.00 , COSTS $ 340.00 . TOTAL $ 6,439.80 , AND FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES LOCATED AT 13613 1/2 DOTY AVENUE HAWTHORNE, CA 90250 , AND THIS JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS OF THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46. ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS ARE ONLY AS TO DEFENDANTS, MANUEL SANDOVAL AND IBETH IBANEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE: EXHIBITS/ DEPOSITION ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2015
  • DocketPREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED BY CLAIMANT (IBANEZ, MANUEL) . . RECEIPT # FW . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 02/27/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY (IBANEZ, MANUEL) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • DocketORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES SIGNED AND FILED AS TO (IBANEZ, MANUEL) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • DocketORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO WAIVE ADDITIONAL COURT FEES SIGNED AND FILED. APPLICANT (IBANEZ, MANUEL) IS PERMITTED TO PROCEED WITHOUT PAYMENT OF THE FOLLOWING COURT FEES: JURY FEES AND EXPENSES .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN PAID. Filing Fee: 240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. WES , HONORABLE H. JAY FORD III .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • DocketMATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 04/27/15 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. CLK .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STAR MANAGEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIEBIG STEVEN J.