This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/17/2016 at 08:03:33 (UTC).

STAR MANAGEMENT VS. MONTERONE, FRANCES

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 STAR MANAGEMENT filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MONTERONE, FRANCES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are H. JAY FORD III and JAMES K. HAHN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3515

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

H. JAY FORD III

Presiding Judge

JAMES K. HAHN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STAR MANAGEMENT LLC

Defendant

MONTERONE FRANCES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FELMAN, DAGGENHURST & EL DABE - EDWARD L FELMAN ESQ

Attorney at FELMAN, DAGGENHURST & EL DABE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2015
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 55.00 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # PAID . MAIL SASE...

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • PURSUANT TO THIS COURT ORDER OF REMAND ISSUED ON 09/24/15 UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT RECEIVED AS TO (MONTERONE, FRANCES) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 11:00A M, IN DEPT. WES , HON. JAMES K. HAHN PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. PLAINTIFF(S) APPEARING JENNA MIYAHARA, ESQ. (X) . DEFENDANT(S) FAILING TO APPEAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS : FOR PLAINTIFF AND AGAINST DEFENDANT FRANCES MONTERONE. :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 09/22/15 , FOR (STAR MANAGEMENT) LLC , AGAINST (MONTERONE, FRANCES) , PAST DUE RENT $ 1650.00 , DAILY DAMAGES $ 4510.00 , ATTORNEY FEES $ 500.00 , COSTS $ 310.00 . TOTAL $ 6,970.00 , AND FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES LOCATED AT 939. SHERBOURNE DR. LOS ANGELES, CA 90035 , AND THIS JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS OF THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE: EXHIBITS/ DEPOSITION ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL ON 09/22/15 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. WES .

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2015
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT AND P & A'S IN SUPPORT THEREOF FILED BY (MONTERONE, FRANCES) . MATTER NOTICED FOR HEARING ON 08/13/15 AT 08:30A M IN DEPT. WES . RECEIPT # FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY (MONTERONE, FRANCES) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES SIGNED AND FILED AS TO (MONTERONE, FRANCES) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO WAIVE ADDITIONAL COURT FEES SIGNED AND FILED. APPLICANT (MONTERONE, FRANCES) IS PERMITTED TO PROCEED WITHOUT PAYMENT OF THE FOLLOWING COURT FEES: JURY FEES AND EXPENSES .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN SM210917017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 01/05/16 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. CLK .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. WES , HONORABLE H. JAY FORD III .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STAR MANAGEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FELMAN EDWARD LUIS