Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/08/2016 at 07:53:30 (UTC).

STAR MANAGEMENT VS. ALLEN, BRITTANY A

Case Summary

On 02/09/2015 STAR MANAGEMENT filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ALLEN, BRITTANY A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are NICOLE HEESEMAN, CARY NISHIMOTO and DOUGLAS W. STERN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0747

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

NICOLE HEESEMAN

CARY NISHIMOTO

DOUGLAS W. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STAR MANAGEMENT

Defendants

ALLEN BRITTANY A

MC NETT SEAN D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF STEVEN K. SIEBIG - STEVEN J. SIEBIG ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF STEVEN K. SIEBIG

LAW OFFICES OF STEVEN J. SIEBIG - STEVEN J. SIEBIG ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF STEVEN J. SIEBIG

Defendant Attorney

SENDUKAS & STEGEN - RONNY SENDUKAS ESQ

Attorney at SENDUKAS & STEGEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2016
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. S12 , HON. DOUGLAS W. STERN PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: MOTION FOR CONTEMPT OF COURT AGAINST STAR MANAGMENT . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: COURT ORDERS PLAINTIFF TO PAY $1,485.00 IN SANCTIONS, PAYABLE TO DEFENDANT'S COUNSEL WITHIN 30 DAYS OF NOTICE. PLAINTIFF IS ORDERED TO ANSWER, WITHOUT OBJECTION, ALL SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES WITHIN 20 DAYS OF NOTICE. A $50.00 CONTEMPT PAYMENT DUE FOR EVERY DAY AFTER THE 20TH DAY, PAYABLE TO DEFENDANT' COUNSEL WITHIN 30 DAYS OF NOTICE. DEFENDANT TO PREPARE A FORMAL ORDER AND GIVE NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF. CLERK OF THE COURT IS ORDERED TO SERVE A COPY OF ATTACHED ORDER UPON ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF (STAR MANAGEMENT) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • DECLARATION RE: OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR CONTEMPT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • DECLARATION RE: OF STEVEN J. SIEBIG IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR MOTION FOR CONTEMPT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • NOTICE OF FEE DUE FOR CLERK TRANSCRIPT-LIMITED CIVIL APPEAL FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • REQUESTING EXHIBITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. S12 , HON. DOUGLAS W. STERN PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES AND SANCTIONS . MOTION IS GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • NOTICE REPLY MEMORANDUM ON MOTION TO COMPEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2015
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. S12 , HON. COMM NICOLE HEESEMAN PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. MATTER CONTINUED FOR COURT TRIAL TO 04/28/15 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. S12 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • STIPULATION FOR COMMISSIONER TO ACT AS TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL ON 03/18/15 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. S12 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2015
  • ANSWER FILED OF (ALLEN, BRITTANY A) , (MC NETT SEAN D) . RECEIPT # PRD .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN PRD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 08/10/15 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. S12 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STAR MANAGEMENT is a litigant