Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/08/2019 at 00:54:08 (UTC).

STACCI L BROOKS VS HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT GROUP., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/05/2019 STACCI L BROOKS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT GROUP . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD F. FRANK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2032

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD F. FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROOKS STACCI L

Defendants

HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT INC.

EL BRACHT TRUST

MANDELL TRUSTEE STAN

HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT GROUP

AVILES HENRY

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/06/2019

9/6/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/06/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

9/6/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

7/29/2019: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/29/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/19/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

8/19/2019: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

7/5/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party / Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketOther - Civil Settlement Agreement; Filed by: Stacci L Brooks (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/06/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Stacci L Brooks on 07/05/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to the written settlement agreement, 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/06/2019 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 09/06/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Stacci L Brooks (Plaintiff); As to: Horizon Real Estate Management Group (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 08/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Stacci L Brooks (Plaintiff); As to: Henry Aviles (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/19/2019; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Stacci L Brooks (Plaintiff); As to: Stan Mandell Trustee (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 07/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Stacci L Brooks (Plaintiff); As to: El Bracht Trust (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 07/24/2019; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from El Bracht Trust (Defendant), Stan Mandell Trustee (Defendant), Horizon Real Estate Management Inc. (Defendant) to Stan Mandell Trustee (Defendant), El Bracht Trust (Defendant), Horizon Real Estate Management Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketAddress for Horizon Real Estate Management Inc. (Defendant) amendment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Docket** Case Name changed from STACCI L BROOKS vs HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT INC., et al. to STACCI L BROOKS vs HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT GROUP., et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Stacci L Brooks (Plaintiff); As to: Horizon Real Estate Management Inc. (Defendant); El Bracht Trust (Defendant); Stan Mandell Trustee (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Stacci L Brooks (Plaintiff); As to: Horizon Real Estate Management Inc. (Defendant); El Bracht Trust (Defendant); Stan Mandell Trustee (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Stacci L Brooks (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Stacci L Brooks (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ronald F. Frank in Department 8 Inglewood Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/06/2019 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT INC is a litigant

Latest cases where HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT GROUP INC. is a litigant