This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/16/2019 at 17:06:29 (UTC).

SPRINGLEAF FINANCIAL SERVICES INC VS ARGENTERA, CECILIA R

Case Summary

On 01/04/2012 SPRINGLEAF FINANCIAL SERVICES INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ARGENTERA, CECILIA R. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, San Pedro Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0005

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Pedro Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SPRINGLEAF FINANCIAL SERVICES INC

SPRINGLEAF FINANCIAL SERVICES INC FKA AMERICAN GENERAL FINANCIAL SERVICES

Defendants

ARGENTERA CECILIA R

RACACHO ROBERT R

ARGENTERA CECILIA R AKA RACACHO CECILIA ARGENTERA

RACACHO ROBERT R AKA RACACHO ROBERT RESQUIR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

STEINGISSER, I. ROBERT

CRAMER, TODD LOREN

CRAMER TODD LOREN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2012
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • OSC CONTINUED TO 12/31/12, 0830 AM, DEPT. 87 RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2012
  • SUBMISSION FOR COURT JUDGMENT PENDING *** DEFAULT PROCESSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2012
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED AS TO DOES 1 TO 20 ONLY. REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED AS TO DOES 1 TO 20 ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2012
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2012
  • OSC SET 07/09/12, 0830 AM, DEPT. 87, NOTICE FILED & MAILED * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED - COLLECTION CASE Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2012
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.