This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2016 at 08:03:50 (UTC).

SPEDLING, ANI VS SKY READY MIX, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/02/2014 SPEDLING, ANI filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SKY READY MIX, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SCOTT NORD, RICHARD WALMARK, RAY SANTANA and RICHARD F. WALMARK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2826

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SCOTT NORD

RICHARD WALMARK

RAY SANTANA

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPEDLING ANI

Defendants

SKY READY MIX INC.

DERAS RAUL

LOPEZ JORGE B.

DERAS SARA

JB EXPRESS PUMPING

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2016
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: ANI SPEDLING (Plaintiff); As to: (SKY READY MIX, INC.) (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 06/14/2016 ; Status Date changed from 09/05/2014 to 06/14/2016 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 06/14/2016 ; Status Date changed from 06/14/2016 to 06/14/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Invoice: Certifying a copy of paper, record, or proceeding on file GC 70626(a)(4); Fee: $25.00; Balance: $25.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Invoice: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Fee: $2.00; Balance: $2.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Payment: Certifying a copy of paper, record, or proceeding on file GC 70626(a)(4); Amount: $25.00 Receipt: VE-2016-0000591 (Cash)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Payment: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Amount: $2.00 Receipt: VE-2016-0000591 (Cash)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (SKY READY MIX, INC.) FOR REJECTION OF CHECK IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00. IT IS UNCLEAR TO THE COURT AS TO WHAT YOU ARE TRYING TO FILE. IF YOU WISH TO PAY THE JUDGMENT TO COURT, YOU MUST USE THE PROPER APPLICATION SEE ATTACHED FORM. SUBMITTED ON 03/17/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. SASE . RECEIPT # LAV482703008 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2014
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 07/10/14 . FOR (SPEDLING, ANI) . AGAINST (DERAS, RAUL) . PRINCIPAL $ 7753.00 . COSTS $ 250.00 . TOTAL $ 8003.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (DERAS, RAUL) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM NWP .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (LOPEZ, JORGE B.) . COSTS OF $ 35.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (JB EXPRESS PUMPING) . COSTS OF $ 35.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (SKY READY MIX, INC.) . COSTS OF $ 35.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (DERAS, SARA) . COSTS OF $ 35.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (DERAS, RAUL) BY SUB-SERVING MS. ARACELI . COSTS OF $ 35.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE/POSTPONEMENT FILED BY (SPEDLING, ANI) . MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 07/10/14 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NWP . RECEIPT # LAV486240016 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2014
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # LAV485216018 . HEARING SET FOR 06/11/14 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NWP

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sky Ready Mix Inc is a litigant