This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/26/2017 at 21:03:59 (UTC).

SPECIALTY BAKING INC VS WHOLESALE MELROSE BAKERY INC

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 SPECIALTY BAKING INC filed an Other lawsuit against WHOLESALE MELROSE BAKERY INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL L. SCHUUR and MARGARET M. BERNAL. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1714

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL L. SCHUUR

MARGARET M. BERNAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPECIALTY BAKING INC

Defendants

KOHNBASH FARZAD

WHOLESALE MELROSE BAKERY INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SAFFOURI HUSSEIN

Defendant Attorney

MOGHADAM RAFI

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2017
  • Opposition to defendant's motion to quash; Filed by: (SPECIALTY BAKING INC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Motion to Quash Service of Summons; Filed by: (WHOLESALE MELROSE BAKERY INC) (Defendant); FARZAD KOHNBASH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Hearing on Motion to Quash scheduled for 08/28/2017 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer; Filed by: (WHOLESALE MELROSE BAKERY INC) (Defendant); FARZAD KOHNBASH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Hearing on Motion to Strike scheduled for 08/31/2017 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by: (SPECIALTY BAKING INC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Rafi Moghadam (Attorney); As to: FARZAD KOHNBASH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER VACATING THE JUDGMENT ANS WRIT OF POSSESSION; Filed by: FARZAD KOHNBASH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter; Filed by: (WHOLESALE MELROSE BAKERY INC) (Defendant); FARZAD KOHNBASH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2017
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (WHOLESALE MELROSE BAKERY INC) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED. MT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (WHOLSALE MELROSE BAKERY INC) , (KOHNBASH, FARZAD) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (WHOLSALE MELROSE BAKERY INC) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • RECEIVED FEES FROM FARZAD KOHANBASH IN THE SUM OF $ 225.00 FOR 1ST APPEARANCE FEES . RECEIPT # NOR509405013 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN NOR183318035. Filing Fee: 240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON 07/19/17 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPARTMENT SEF . D.S .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPECIALTY BAKING INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SAFFOURI HUSSEIN