This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/14/2019 at 17:06:06 (UTC).

SPECIALTY BAKING INC VS NAPOLEON BAKERY INC

Case Summary

On 09/28/2016 SPECIALTY BAKING INC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against NAPOLEON BAKERY INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL L. SCHUUR, MARGARET M. BERNAL, LORI ANN FOUNIER, JAMES KADDO, PATRICK T. MEYERS and LORI ANN FOURNIER. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3170

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES KADDO

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL L. SCHUUR

MARGARET M. BERNAL

LORI ANN FOUNIER

PATRICK T. MEYERS

LORI ANN FOURNIER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

SPECIALTY BAKING INC

Defendants and Appellants

KOHANBASH FARZAD

WHOLESOME MELROSE BAKERY INC

NAPOLEON BAKERY INC

Claimant

RODAS ROSALIA

Not Classified By Court

ON-CALL LEGAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RAMSEY LAW GROUP - HUSSEIN SAFFOURI

Attorney at RAMSEY LAW GROUP

SAFFOURI HUSSEIN MOHAMMAD

Defendant Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF RAFI MOGHADAM - RAFI MOGHADAM

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF RAFI MOGHADAM

MOGHADAM RAFI

 

Court Documents

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

1/23/2017: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Minute Order

11/7/2016: Minute Order

Other - (name extension) - REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION BY PLAINTIFF

11/7/2016: Other - (name extension) - REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION BY PLAINTIFF

Minute Order

11/9/2016: Minute Order

Ex Parte Application (name extension) - re: ORDER CONTINUING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Points and Authorities, Declaration re: Notice

11/16/2016: Ex Parte Application (name extension) - re: ORDER CONTINUING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Points and Authorities, Declaration re: Notice

Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge

11/29/2016: Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge

Minute Order

12/14/2016: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/4/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/9/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/20/2017: Minute Order

Other - (name extension) - Plaintiff's List of Exhibits for Trial

1/23/2017: Other - (name extension) - Plaintiff's List of Exhibits for Trial

Motion in Limine (name extension) - Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Evidence of Unclean Hands

2/28/2017: Motion in Limine (name extension) - Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Evidence of Unclean Hands

Motion in Limine (name extension) - Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Evidence Denying Landlord's Title

2/28/2017: Motion in Limine (name extension) - Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Evidence Denying Landlord's Title

Minute Order

3/10/2017: Minute Order

Other - (name extension) - Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Nonsuit Following Opening Statement

3/15/2017: Other - (name extension) - Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Nonsuit Following Opening Statement

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

4/25/2017: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Other - (name extension) - Minute Order and Clerk's Notice of Ruling and/or Appealable Order

6/13/2017: Other - (name extension) - Minute Order and Clerk's Notice of Ruling and/or Appealable Order

Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal - Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal SUPPLEMENTAL BV032570

11/19/2018: Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal - Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal SUPPLEMENTAL BV032570

127 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned to Norwalk Courthouse in Department W - Hon. Paul Bruguera

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by: FARZAD KOHANBASH (Defendant); Judge Name: Patrick T. Meyers

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 92 on [ln 8, col 47] with Document:74596520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer (CCP ...) of 11/12/2019: Status Date changed from 11/12/2019 to 11/12/2019; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order re Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer (CCP ...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order re Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer (CCP ...) of 11/12/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Remittitur - Reversed BV032570; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketAppeal - Reporter Appeal Transcripts; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketAppeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid Respondent; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketAppeal Document SUPPLEMENTAL CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT CERTIFICATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
211 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2016
  • DocketREJECT SHEET SENT TO (SPECIALTY BAKING INC) FOR REJECTION OF PROOF OF SERVICE: PROOF OF SERVICE FOR ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS MUST INCLUDE POSTING OF DOCUMENTS ON PREMISES. SUBMITTED ON 10/07/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY (KOHANBASH, FARZAD) , (WHOLESOME MELROSE BAKERY), INC .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • DocketPREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED BY CLAIMANT (KOHANBASH, FARZAD) , (WHOLESOME MELROSE BAKERY), INC . . RECEIPT # NOR443666016 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 10/12/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (NAPOLEON BAKERY INC) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (NAPOLEON BAKERY INC) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • DocketMATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON 11/14/16 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPARTMENT SEF . .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN NOR443666016. Filing Fee: 240.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 16UN3170    Hearing Date: January 06, 2020    Dept: SEG

SPECIALTY BAKING, INC. v. NAPOLEON BAKERY, INC.

CASE NO.: 16UN3170

DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES ON APPEAL

The Court finds the moving party prevailed on appeal and is entitled to attorney's fees of $27,374.00. These are ordered stayed pending resolution of all of the present matters between the parties.