Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/21/2021 at 03:19:24 (UTC).

SOUTHWEST HEATING & AIR CONDITIONING, INC., ET AL. VS DOMENICK VALADEZ

Case Summary

On 01/10/2020 SOUTHWEST HEATING AIR CONDITIONING, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DOMENICK VALADEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS J. GRIEGO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0748

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS J. GRIEGO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SOUTHWEST HEATING & AIR CONDITIONING INC.

WIZMANN STEPHANE Y

Defendant

VALADEZ DOMENICK

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/19/2021

1/19/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/19/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

1/19/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

6/18/2020: Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

6/18/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

4/27/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

4/27/2020: Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

3/11/2020: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

3/30/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/30/2020

3/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/30/2020

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1/10/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

1/10/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

1/10/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Southwest Heating & Air Conditioning, Inc., et al. on 01/10/2020, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/19/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A updated: Result Date to 01/19/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/08/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 01/19/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/16/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 09/08/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/30/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/16/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 06/16/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Southwest Heating & Air Conditioning, Inc. (Plaintiff); Stephane Y Wizmann (Plaintiff); As to: Domenick Valadez (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 02/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas J. Griego in Department 1A Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Southwest Heating & Air Conditioning, Inc. (Plaintiff); Stephane Y Wizmann (Plaintiff); As to: Domenick Valadez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHWEST HEATING & AIR CONDITIONING INC. is a litigant