This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/22/2019 at 09:59:26 (UTC).

SOUTHERN WINE & SPIRITS OF AMERICA VS DALY CITY VENUE MANAGEMENT SERVICES

Case Summary

On 06/09/2017 SOUTHERN WINE SPIRITS OF AMERICA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DALY CITY VENUE MANAGEMENT SERVICES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7439

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTHERN WINE & SPIRITS OF AMERICA

Defendants

TORRES FRANCO

DALY CITY VENUE MANAGEMENT SERVICES DBA HIDEOUT BAR & LOUNGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARWACKI & ASSOCIATES

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service - No Service

10/4/2017: Proof of Service - No Service

Request for Dismissal

9/26/2017: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

10/04/2017

DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2017

DocketRequest for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2017

DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: SOUTHERN WINE & SPIRITS OF AMERICA (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2017

DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/10/2018 at 08:30 AM in at Department 77 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/26/2017

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2017

DocketOSC - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/09/2020 at 08:30 AM in at Department 77 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/26/2017

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2017

DocketDECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2017

DocketDECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2017

DocketNON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 12/10/18, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2017

DocketOSC SET 06/09/20, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 77 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2017

DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - BREACH OF CONTRACT Filing Fee: 225.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2017

DocketSUMMONS FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less