This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/13/2021 at 05:28:32 (UTC).

SOUTHERN WINE & SPIRITS OF AMERICA, INC. VS PHAT & JUICY CHICKEN AND WAFFLES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/01/2018 SOUTHERN WINE SPIRITS OF AMERICA, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PHAT JUICY CHICKEN AND WAFFLES, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0186

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTHERN WINE & SPIRITS OF AMERICA INC.

Defendants

PHAT & JUICY CHICKEN AND WAFFLES INC. DBA PHAT & JUICY CHICKEN AND WAFFLES

PAUL DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARWACKI RAYMOND DANIEL JR

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

10/14/2021: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

10/14/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

10/15/2021: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

2/20/2020: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)

2/27/2020: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

12/17/2020: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution

12/31/2020: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

11/21/2019: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/17/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration re: Lost Agreement/Contract

6/11/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration re: Lost Agreement/Contract

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

6/11/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

6/11/2019: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration CCP 1033 B (1) & (2)

6/11/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration CCP 1033 B (1) & (2)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/11/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration re: Accrued Interest

6/11/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration re: Accrued Interest

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

6/11/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

6/24/2019: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

10/24/2018: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketWrit of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: Southern Wine & Spirits of America, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: David Paul (Defendant); County: LOS ANGELES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketAddress for Raymond Daniel Garwacki, Jr (Attorney) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Raymond Daniel Garwacki, Jr (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: Southern Wine & Spirits of America, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: David Paul (Defendant); Interest: 1930.47; Service Date: 10/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (Los Angeles): Name Extension: (Los Angeles); As To Parties changed from David Paul (Defendant) to David Paul (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution; Issued by: Southern Wine & Spirits of America, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: David Paul (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: Southern Wine & Spirits of America, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: David Paul (Defendant); Interest: 1211.41; Service Date: 12/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Southern Wine & Spirits of America, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: David Paul (Defendant); County: Los Angeles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: Southern Wine & Spirits of America, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: David Paul (Defendant); Interest: 547.31; Service Date: 02/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 94 - Hon. James E. Blancarte; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Southern Wine & Spirits of America, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: Phat & Juicy Chicken and Waffles, INC. (Defendant); Service Date: 09/10/18; Service Cost: 90.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Southern Wine & Spirits of America, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: David Paul (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/12/18; Service Cost: 70.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Southern Wine & Spirits of America, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: Phat & Juicy Chicken and Waffles, INC. (Defendant); David Paul (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Southern Wine & Spirits of America, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/29/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PHAT & JUICY CHICKEN AND WAFFLES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN WINE & SPIRITS OF NOTHERN CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARWACKI JR. RAYMOND DANIEL