This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/20/2021 at 06:17:47 (UTC).

SOUTHERN GLAZER'S WINE & SPIRITS, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS RUSTED MULE, AB, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/27/2020 SOUTHERN GLAZER'S WINE SPIRITS, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RUSTED MULE, AB, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2828

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTHERN GLAZER'S WINE & SPIRITS LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AKA SOUTHERN WINE & SPIRITS OF AMERICA INC. A CORPORATION

Defendants

1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE DOES

VILA AN INDIVIDUAL RICHARD

RUSTED MULE AB LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA RUSTED MULE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARWACKI JR. RAY

Defendant Attorney

BOYAJIAN A. JAMES

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/27/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/27/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/27/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

3/27/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Complaint - Complaint

3/27/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Stipulation for Judgment - Stipulation for Judgment

9/17/2021: Stipulation for Judgment - Stipulation for Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

9/3/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

5/12/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Motion to Quash Service of Summons - Motion to Quash Service of Summons

2/26/2021: Motion to Quash Service of Summons - Motion to Quash Service of Summons

Motion to Quash Service of Summons - Motion to Quash Service of Summons

2/26/2021: Motion to Quash Service of Summons - Motion to Quash Service of Summons

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

1/25/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

1/25/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketStipulation for Judgment; Signed and Filed by: Southern Glazer's Wine & Spirits, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: Rusted Mule, AB, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketStipulated judgment entered for Plaintiff Southern Glazer's Wine & Spirits, LLC, a Limited Liability Company AKA Southern Wine & Spirits of America, Inc., a Corporation against Defendant Rusted Mule, AB, LLC, a Limited Liability Company DBA Rusted Mule on the Complaint filed by Southern Glazer's Wine & Spirits, LLC, a Limited Liability Company on 03/27/2020 for the principal amount of $12,500.00 for a total of $12,500.00.; See written stipulation for further terms and conditions.; Execution stayed pursuant to written stipulation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 09/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons scheduled for 09/20/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Southern Glazer's Wine & Spirits, LLC, a Limited Liability Company on 03/27/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Southern Glazer's Wine & Spirits, LLC, a Limited Liability Company, does 1-10 only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons scheduled for 09/20/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons scheduled for 08/25/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 09/20/2021 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Quash Notice of Motion and Motion to Quash Service of Summons and Dismiss Defendant Richard Vila from this Action for Inconvenient Forum scheduled for 07/29/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Southern Glazer's Wine & Spirits, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: Rusted Mule, AB, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Service Date: 01/14/2021; Service Cost: 80.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Southern Glazer's Wine & Spirits, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: Richard Vila, an Individual (Defendant); Service Date: 01/13/2021; Service Cost: 120.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Southern Glazer's Wine & Spirits, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: Rusted Mule, AB, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Richard Vila, an Individual (Defendant); DOES 1 through 10, Inclusive (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Southern Glazer's Wine & Spirits, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: Rusted Mule, AB, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Richard Vila, an Individual (Defendant); DOES 1 through 10, Inclusive (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Southern Glazer's Wine & Spirits, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: Rusted Mule, AB, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Richard Vila, an Individual (Defendant); DOES 1 through 10, Inclusive (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: 20STLC02828 Hearing Date: September 20, 2021 Dept: 25

PROCEEDINGS: MOTION\r\nTO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

MOVING PARTY: Defendant\r\nRusted Mule AB, LLC

\r\n\r\n

RESP. PARTY: None

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS

\r\n\r\n

(CCP § 418.10)

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

TENTATIVE RULING:

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Defendant Rusted Mule AB, LLC’s Motion\r\nto Quash Service of Summons is PLACED OFF CALENDAR AS MOOT.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

SERVICE: \r\n

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

[X]\r\nProof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

\r\n\r\n

[X]\r\nCorrect Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

\r\n\r\n

[X]\r\n16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

OPPOSITION: None filed as of September\r\n16, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

\r\n\r\n

REPLY: None filed as\r\nof September 16, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

ANALYSIS:

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

I. \r\nBackground\r\n& Discussion

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

On March 27, 2020, Plaintiff Southern Glazer’s Wine &\r\nSpirits, LLC (“Plaintiff”) filed an action against Rusted Mule AB, LLC (“Rusted\r\nMule”) and Richard Villa (“Villa”) (collectively, “Defendants”) alleging breach\r\nof contract, open book account, account stated, reasonable value, and breach of\r\nwarranty.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Defendant Rusted Mule filed the instant Motion to Quash\r\nService of Summons (the “Motion”) on February 26, 2021. Defendant Villa was\r\ndismissed from this action on May 12.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

The Court electronically received a\r\nProposed Stipulated Consent Judgment executed by Plaintiff and Defendant Rusted\r\nMule on September 3, 2021.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

As it appears the parties have\r\nresolved their dispute, the instant Motion is PLACED OFF CALENDAR AS MOOT.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

II. \r\nConclusion\r\n& Order

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

For the foregoing reasons, Defendant\r\nRusted Mule AB, LLC’s Motion to Quash Service of Summons is PLACED OFF CALENDAR\r\nAS MOOT.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Moving party is ordered to give\r\nnotice.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

'
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN GLAZER'S WINE & SPIRITS LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARWACKI JR. RAY