This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/02/2021 at 05:11:51 (UTC).

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS STEPHEN DORECK EQUIPMENT RENTALS, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/01/2020 SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against STEPHEN DORECK EQUIPMENT RENTALS, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8302

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

STEPHEN DORECK EQUIPMENT RENTALS INC.

GOLDEN STATE WATER COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEVY NAZILA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/1/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

10/1/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/1/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/1/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

10/1/2020: Complaint - Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2023
  • Hearing10/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • Hearing04/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Southern California Gas Company, a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Stephen Doreck Equipment Rentals, Inc. (Defendant); Golden State Water Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Southern California Gas Company, a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Stephen Doreck Equipment Rentals, Inc. (Defendant); Golden State Water Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Southern California Gas Company, a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Stephen Doreck Equipment Rentals, Inc. (Defendant); Golden State Water Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STEPHEN DORECK EQUIPMENT RENTALS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where GOLDEN STATE WATER COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVY NAZILA Y. ESQ.