This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/03/2019 at 12:41:55 (UTC).

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COM VS UNITED PACIFIC SERVICES, INC.

Case Summary

On 05/21/2014 SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COM filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNITED PACIFIC SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HOWARD L. HALM. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5349

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

HOWARD L. HALM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

UNITED PACIFIC SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORTION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFF OF JAVIER C. RIVERA - PATRICIA CIRUCCI

Attorney at LAW OFF OF JAVIER C. RIVERA

CIRUCCI PATRICIA

Defendant Attorneys

HALAS & MUHAR - DONALD G. FURNESS

Attorney at HALAS & MUHAR

FURNESS DONALD G.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2019
  • Order case file destroyed per section(s) 71008 and/or 68152 of the Government Code; Issued by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2014
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL: THE COURT CANNOT ACCEPT ANY DOCUMENTS WITH WHITE OUT OR CORRECTION TAPE SUBMITTED ON 12/16/14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2014
  • ANSWER FILED OF UNITED PACIFIC SERVICES INC . RECEIPT # NOR285409013 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2014
  • MATTER SET FOR COURT TRIAL ON 07/30/15 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. SEY .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2014
  • NOTICE OF COURT TRIAL FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO UNITED PACIFIC SERVICES, INC SERVED GUS FRANKLIN ON 05/27/2014 . COSTS OF $ 60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR265476002. Filing Fee: 225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY HOWARD L. HALM, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(F). MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING ON 11/01/17 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. SEY . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED, GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY HOWARD L. HALM, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(F). MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING ON 11/01/17 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. SEY . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED, GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNITED PACIFIC SERVICES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FURNESS ESQ. DONALD G.