This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/15/2019 at 00:16:36 (UTC).

SORRENTO BEACH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION VS E ENGINEERS

Case Summary

On 09/05/2018 SORRENTO BEACH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against E ENGINEERS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MATTHEW ST. GEORGE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2829

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MATTHEW ST. GEORGE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SORRENTO BEACH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION DBA THE SORRENTO GRILL HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendants

E ENGINEERS

PERIC ERIC DBA E EGINEERS

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

9/5/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

9/5/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/16/2018

10/16/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/16/2018

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

10/16/2018: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

10/16/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

10/16/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

10/16/2018: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

10/24/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/16/2018

11/16/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/16/2018

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

11/16/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

11/6/2018: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

11/16/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2018
  • On the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by Sorrento Beach Homeowners Association on 10/24/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Eric Peric (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/16/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/16/2018 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department E updated: Result Date to 11/16/2018; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Sorrento Beach Homeowners Association (Plaintiff); As to: Eric Peric (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 10/31/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Sorrento Beach Homeowners Association (Plaintiff); As to: Eric Peric (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Updated -- Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims): Filed By: Sorrento Beach Homeowners Association (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 10/16/2018; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Sorrento Beach Homeowners Association (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/16/2018 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department E updated: Result Date to 10/16/2018; Result Type to Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/16/2018 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Sorrento Beach Homeowners Association (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Matthew St. George in Department E Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/16/2018 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Sorrento Beach Homeowners Association (Plaintiff); As to: E Engineers (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SORRENTO BEACH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION [DOE 1] is a litigant