This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/25/2019 at 00:34:29 (UTC).

SONIA MARIA VARGAS VS ALEJANDRO SAUCEDO

Case Summary

On 09/10/2018 SONIA MARIA VARGAS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALEJANDRO SAUCEDO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4700

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VARGAS SONIA MARIA

Whittier, CA 90601

Defendant

SAUCEDO ALEJANDRO

Los Angeles, CA 90032

 

Court Documents

Other - (name extension) - Other - Statement of Decision

11/1/2018: Other - (name extension) - Other - Statement of Decision

Other - (name extension) - Other - EXHIBITS RECEIPT

11/19/2018: Other - (name extension) - Other - EXHIBITS RECEIPT

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

9/10/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 11/01/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

11/1/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 11/01/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/10/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

11/1/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil) - Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil)

1/7/2019: Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil) - Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

9/10/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

11/1/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

10/15/2018: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

11/1/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2019
  • Notice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Sonia Maria Vargas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Case reassigned to Bellflower Courthouse in Department 1 - Hon. Carol Rose; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Other - EXHIBITS RECEIPT; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/01/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 11/01/2018; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 11/01/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Sonia Maria Vargas against Defendant Alejandro Saucedo on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Sonia Maria Vargas on 09/10/2018 for the principal amount of $4,300.00 and costs of $85.00 for a total of $4,385.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Other - Statement of Decision; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Sonia Maria Vargas (Plaintiff); As to: Alejandro Saucedo (Defendant); Service Cost: 35.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 10/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • Case assigned to in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/01/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Sonia Maria Vargas (Plaintiff); As to: Alejandro Saucedo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.