This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/22/2021 at 07:07:59 (UTC).

SOLEDAD FIERRO VS CATHEDRAL OF OUR LADY OF THE ANGELS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/01/2020 SOLEDAD FIERRO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CATHEDRAL OF OUR LADY OF THE ANGELS,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RAY A. SANTANA. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6963

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RAY A. SANTANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIERRO SOLEDAD

Defendants

ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES INS. CO.

CATHEDRAL OF OUR LADY OF THE ANGELS

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

12/1/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer]

2/24/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer]

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Eileen Bonaduci

3/26/2021: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Eileen Bonaduci

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

3/26/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/26/2021

3/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/26/2021

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Eileen Bonaduci

3/26/2021: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Eileen Bonaduci

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/26/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Soledad Fierro on 12/01/2020, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/26/2021 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 updated: Result Date to 03/26/2021; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Eileen Bonaduci; Filed by: Archdiocese of Los Angeles Ins. Co. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Eileen Bonaduci; Filed by: Cathedral of Our Lady of the Angels (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Soledad Fierro (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Cathedral of Our Lady of the Angels (Defendant), Archdiocese of Los Angeles Ins. Co. (Defendant) to Archdiocese of Los Angeles Ins. Co. (Defendant), Cathedral of Our Lady of the Angels (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/26/2021 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Soledad Fierro (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Soledad Fierro (Plaintiff); As to: Cathedral of Our Lady of the Angels (Defendant); Archdiocese of Los Angeles Ins. Co. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ray A. Santana in Department 90 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE CATHEDRAL OF OUR LADY OF THE ANGELS A CORPORATION SOLE is a litigant

Latest cases where ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES THE is a litigant