Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/03/2021 at 06:22:17 (UTC).

SODIQ JAIYEADE VS NYALA BELLA TRINGALI-CARBADO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/03/2020 SODIQ JAIYEADE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NYALA BELLA TRINGALI-CARBADO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9271

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAIYEADE SODIQ

Defendants

TRINGALI-CARBADO NYALA BELLA

TRINGALI GIOVANNA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERKLEY STUART

Defendant Attorney

CHUN ARANG

 

Court Documents

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

4/2/2021: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Answer - Answer

4/2/2021: Answer - Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/2/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Motion to Quash Service of Summons - Motion to Quash Service of Summons

1/28/2021: Motion to Quash Service of Summons - Motion to Quash Service of Summons

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons) of 02/24/2021

2/24/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons) of 02/24/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons)

2/24/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/3/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/3/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/3/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

11/3/2020: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

11/3/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/3/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2023
  • Hearing11/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • Hearing05/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons) of 02/24/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons scheduled for 02/24/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 02/24/2021; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Quash Service of Summons: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons scheduled for 02/24/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketMotion to Quash Service of Summons; Filed by: Nyala Bella Tringali-Carbado (Defendant); Giovanna Tringali (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Sodiq Jaiyeade (Plaintiff); As to: Nyala Bella Tringali-Carbado (Defendant); Giovanna Tringali (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Sodiq Jaiyeade (Plaintiff); As to: Nyala Bella Tringali-Carbado (Defendant); Giovanna Tringali (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Sodiq Jaiyeade (Plaintiff); As to: Nyala Bella Tringali-Carbado (Defendant); Giovanna Tringali (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Sodiq Jaiyeade (Plaintiff); As to: Nyala Bella Tringali-Carbado (Defendant); Giovanna Tringali (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STLC09271    Hearing Date: February 24, 2021    Dept: 26

Jaiyeade v. Tringali-Carbado, et al.

MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE

(CCP § 418.10)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendants Nyala Bela Tringali-Carbado and Giovanna Tringali’s Motion to Quash Service of the Summons and Complaint is GRANTED.

ANALYSIS:

On November 3, 2020, Plaintiff Sodiq Jaiyeade (“Plaintiff”) filed the Complaint in this action for motor vechile negligence against Defendants Nyala Bela Tringali-Carbado and Giovanna Tringali (“Defendants”). On January 28, 2021, Defendants filed the instant Motion to Quash Service of the Summons and Complaint. To date, no proof of service of the Summons and Complaint has been filed, nor has Plaintiff filed an opposition.

Discussion

Defendants move to quash service of the Summons and Complaint on the grounds that they were served by substituted service at an address that is neither the Defendants’ residence nor business address, and such service does not comport with the requirements of Code of Civil Procedure section 415.20.

Where service is challenged, the burden is on the plaintiff to prove the facts requisite to an effective service. (Lebel v. Mai (2012) 210 Cal.App.4th 1154, 1160.) Plaintiff’s counsel emailed copies of the proof of service to defense counsel on January 25, 2020. (Motion, Chun Decl., ¶2 and Exh. B.) Defense counsel responded by challenging the validity of the purported substituted service upon a “Jane Doe” at 819 5th Avenue, Los Angeles, CA 90005, and provided Plaintiff’s counsel evidence that Defendants did not reside at or conduct business at that location on November 13, 2020, the date service was purportedly effectuated. (Motion, Chun Decl., ¶3; Tringali-Carbado Decl., ¶3-4; Tringali Decl.. ¶3-4; and, Exhs. A, C.) Nevertheless, Plaintiff’s counsel demanded that Defendants file an answer to the Complaint or risk entry of default. (Motion, Chun Decl., ¶3 and Exh. C.) Thereupon. Defendants filed the instant Motion to Quash Service.

Defendants having properly challenged the propriety of service, the burden now shifts to Plaintiff to demonstrate that service complies with the statutory requirements. No such showing has been made, however, because Plaintiff has not filed an opposition to this Motion.

Conclusion

Therefore, Defendants Nyala Bela Tringali-Carbado and Giovanna Tringali’s Motion to Quash Service of the Summons and Complaint is GRANTED.

Court clerk to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BERKLEY STUART