This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2019 at 18:28:36 (UTC).

SOCAL LIEN SOLUTIONS A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS REBEKA SHADPOUR, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/09/2018 SOCAL LIEN SOLUTIONS A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against REBEKA SHADPOUR,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3386

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOCAL LIEN SOLUTIONS A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

WEALTH ROAD REALTY INC.

SHADPOUR REBEKA

JK 7 LLC

DIANA FARAJOLLAH ZADEH LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARIKH SAGAR P.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/9/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Notice Of Rejection - Request For Dismissal

4/4/2018: Notice Of Rejection - Request For Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

4/5/2018: Request for Dismissal

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/9/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/9/2018: Complaint

Summons - on Complaint

3/9/2018: Summons - on Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/06/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/05/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/05/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketRequest for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: SOCAL Lien Solutions A California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketNotice Of Rejection - Request For Dismissal; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Georgina T. Rizk in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/06/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: SOCAL Lien Solutions A California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: Rebeka Shadpour (Defendant); Wealth Road Realty, Inc. (Defendant); Diana Farajollah Zadeh LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SOCAL Lien Solutions A California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIANA FARAJOLLAHZADEH LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SOCAL LIEN SOLUTIONS LLC is a litigant