Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2021 at 12:42:04 (UTC).

SMITH BROS., INC VS JORDAN BLAKE

Case Summary

On 06/05/2020 SMITH BROS , INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JORDAN BLAKE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1046

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SMITH BROS. INC

Defendant

BLAKE JORDAN

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

6/5/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

6/5/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/18/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Attachment - Attachment

9/21/2020: Attachment - Attachment

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Attachment]

9/21/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Attachment]

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]

12/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]

Request for Court Order and Answer - Request for Court Order and Answer

12/28/2020: Request for Court Order and Answer - Request for Court Order and Answer

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

12/31/2020: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Notice of Postponement - Notice of Postponement

12/31/2020: Notice of Postponement - Notice of Postponement

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice Notice of Online Dispute Resolution Meet and Confer]

2/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice Notice of Online Dispute Resolution Meet and Confer]

Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims) - Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims)

3/19/2021: Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims) - Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

3/26/2021: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/26/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Postponement - Notice of Postponement

3/29/2021: Notice of Postponement - Notice of Postponement

Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

3/29/2021: Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

3/30/2021: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2021
  • Hearing07/16/2021 at 01:30 PM in Department S at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims): As To Parties changed from Jordan Blake (Defendant on defendant's claim) to Jordan Blake (Defendant on defendant's claim)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of defendant, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/08/2021 at 03:00 PM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 07/16/2021 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Smith Bros., Inc (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: Maybe

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketOrder on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk; As to: Jordan Blake (Defendant on defendant's claim)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Postponement; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Jordan Blake (Defendant on defendant's claim); As to: Smith Bros., Inc (Plaintiff on defendant's claim); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/22/2021; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Jordan Blake (Defendant); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims); Filed by: Jordan Blake (Defendant on defendant's claim); As to: Smith Bros., Inc (Plaintiff on defendant's claim)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketNotice Notice of Online Dispute Resolution Meet and Confer; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Smith Bros., Inc (Plaintiff); Jordan Blake (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketPursuant to the request of defendant, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/12/2021 at 10:00 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Party was rescheduled to 04/08/2021 03:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketRequest for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: Jordan Blake (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Attachment]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAttachment; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Smith Bros., Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Jordan Blake (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/15/2020; Service Cost: 250.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/12/2021 at 10:00 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld in Department S Santa Monica Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Smith Bros., Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Jordan Blake (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SMITH BROS INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant