This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/29/2020 at 08:51:40 (UTC).

SM 10000 PROPERTY, LLC VS JOSEPH LAM

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 SM 10000 PROPERTY, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JOSEPH LAM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2458

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SM 10000 PROPERTY LLC

Defendant

LAM JOSEPH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EVANS CHRIS

 

Court Documents

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

12/5/2019: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Complaint - Complaint

12/5/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/5/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/5/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/5/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Joseph Lam)

12/11/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Joseph Lam)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

12/11/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

1/9/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

1/9/2020: Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/9/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/9/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/9/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration for Default Judgment by Court (Unlawful Detainer) - Declaration for Default Judgment by Court (Unlawful Detainer)

1/16/2020: Declaration for Default Judgment by Court (Unlawful Detainer) - Declaration for Default Judgment by Court (Unlawful Detainer)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/16/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer By Court

1/20/2020: Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer By Court

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer By Court: Filed By: SM 10000 Property, LLC (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 01/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff SM 10000 Property, LLC against Defendant Joseph Lam on the Complaint filed by SM 10000 Property, LLC on 12/05/2019 for past rent due in the amount of $15,174.00, holdover damages $14,933.20, attorney fees of $1,042.87, costs of $505.00, and other $-14,226.10 for a total of $17,428.97.; The Rental Agreement under which the property is held is hereby cancelled.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment - Unlawful Detainer By Court; Signed and Filed by: SM 10000 Property, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Joseph Lam (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer By Clerk: Name Extension: By Clerk; As To Parties changed from Joseph Lam (Defendant) to Joseph Lam (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Entry of Default / Judgment By Clerk: Name Extension: By Clerk; As To Parties changed from Joseph Lam (Defendant) to Joseph Lam (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Entry of Default / Judgment By Court: Name Extension: By Court; As To Parties changed from Joseph Lam (Defendant) to Joseph Lam (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: SM 10000 Property, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Joseph Lam (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketDeclaration for Default Judgment by Court (Unlawful Detainer); Filed by: SM 10000 Property, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Joseph Lam (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Joseph Lam; On the Complaint filed by SM 10000 Property, LLC on 12/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff SM 10000 Property, LLC against Defendant Joseph Lam on the Complaint filed by SM 10000 Property, LLC on 12/05/2019 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 10000 Santa Monica Boulevard, #2606, Los Angeles, CA 90067 is granted for plaintiff(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: SM 10000 Property, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: SM 10000 Property, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; Proof of Mailing Date: 12/16/2019; Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 12/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/13/2020 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld in Department S Santa Monica Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SM 10000 Property, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Joseph Lam (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: SM 10000 Property, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Joseph Lam (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: SM 10000 Property, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Joseph Lam (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SM 10000 PROPERTY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EVANS CHRIS