Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/05/2019 at 18:30:37 (UTC).

SIMON O. EZENDUKA VS TRANS-FAST REMITTANCE, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/09/2017 SIMON O EZENDUKA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TRANS-FAST REMITTANCE, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4308

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EZENDUKA SIMON O.

Hawthorne, CA 90250

Defendants

TRANS-FAST REMITTANCE LLC

818 West 7Th Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017

CONFIDENCE INSURANCE

8611 S. Crenshaw Blvd. #210

Inglewood, CA 90305

 

Court Documents

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

12/15/2017: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

9/27/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

9/27/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

9/28/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

9/27/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

8/2/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/02/2017

8/2/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/02/2017

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

8/2/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

7/17/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

6/27/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

6/9/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2017
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Simon O. Ezenduka (Plaintiff); As to: Trans-Fast Remittance, LLC (Defendant); Confidence Insurance (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 12/15/2017 ; Status Date changed from 09/27/2017 to 12/15/2017 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 12/15/2017 ; Status Date changed from 12/15/2017 to 12/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/27/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 09/27/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Simon O. Ezenduka against Defendant Confidence Insurance and Defendant Trans-Fast Remittance, LLC on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Simon O. Ezenduka on 06/09/2017 for the principal amount of $2,460.00 and costs of $115.00 for a total of $2,575.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • On the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/02/2017 at 01:30 PM in at Department 8 Not Held - Continued - Court Congestion to 09/27/2017 01:30 PM at 09/27/2017 1:30 PM Non-Jury Trial in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Simon O. Ezenduka (Plaintiff); As to: Confidence Insurance (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 06/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/27/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Simon O. Ezenduka (Plaintiff); As to: Trans-Fast Remittance, LLC (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 06/23/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Simon O. Ezenduka (Plaintiff); As to: Trans-Fast Remittance, LLC (Defendant); Confidence Insurance (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0013916 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • Invoice: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0013916 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/02/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less