This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2019 at 14:12:33 (UTC).

SILVIA MARTINEZ NAVARRO VS ROBERT C. WORTH, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/05/2018 SILVIA MARTINEZ NAVARRO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ROBERT C WORTH, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1897

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MARTINEZ MAGALIA

NAVARRO SILVIA MARTINEZ

Defendants

WORTH RYAN JEFFREY

ROBERT C. WORTH INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIPEL KATHERINE

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

7/19/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

3/15/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing - Application of Guardian Ad Litem

3/1/2018: Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing - Application of Guardian Ad Litem

Summons - on Complaint

6/25/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

5/23/2018: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

5/23/2018: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing

2/5/2018: Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing

Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing

2/5/2018: Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/5/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/5/2018: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/5/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/05/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Silvia Martinez Navarro, et al. on 02/05/2018, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by BRANDON PARDO, BRISEYDA PARDO, Magalia Martinez, Silvia Martinez Navarro, Silvia Martinez Navarro, and Silvia Martinez Navarro as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Silvia Martinez Navarro (Plaintiff); Magalia Martinez (Plaintiff); Silvia Martinez Navarro (Plaintiff); Silvia Martinez Navarro (Plaintiff); BRANDON PARDO (Plaintiff); BRISEYDA PARDO (Plaintiff); As to: Silvia Martinez Navarro (Plaintiff); Silvia Martinez Navarro (Plaintiff); Silvia Martinez Navarro (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Silvia Martinez Navarro (Plaintiff); As to: Robert C. Worth, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 07/15/2018; Service Cost: 49.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketBrandon Pardo, a minor by and through guardian ad litem Silvia Martinez Navarro; Filed by: Silvia Martinez Navarro (Plaintiff); As to: BRANDON PARDO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketBriseyda Pardo, a minor by and through guardian ad litem Silvia Martinez Navarro; Filed by: Silvia Martinez Navarro (Plaintiff); As to: BRISEYDA PARDO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Katherine Lipel (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Katherine Lipel to Law Offices of Katherine Lipel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketAddress for Katherine Lipel (Attorney) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Silvia Martinez Navarro (Plaintiff); As to: Robert C. Worth, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- BRANDON PARDO, A MINOR BY AND THROUGH GUARDIAN AD LITEM SILVIA MARTINEZ NAVARRO: Status Date changed from 03/01/2018 to 02/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- BRISEYDA PARDO, A MINOR BY AND THROUGH GUARDIAN AD LITEM SILVIA MARTINEZ NAVARRO: Status Date changed from 03/01/2018 to 02/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing: Status Date changed from 03/01/2018 to 02/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing: Status Date changed from 03/01/2018 to 02/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Silvia Martinez Navarro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine Lu in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/05/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROBERT C WORTH INC A CALIFORNIA CORP is a litigant