This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/03/2012 at 06:45:38 (UTC).

SILVERMAN REALTY CORP. VS. CHANDLER, ROBERT

Case Summary

On 01/13/2012 SILVERMAN REALTY CORP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CHANDLER, ROBERT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0031

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Beverly Hills Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SILVERMAN REALTY CORP.

Defendants

CHANDLER ROBERT

CHANDLER WENDELYN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - CRAIG MORDOH ESQ

Defendant Attorney

LD LAW OFFICES - LEONARDO DRUBACH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2012
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL ON 04/06/12AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2012
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED AND MAILED TORESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEFILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2012
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2012
  • ANSWER FILED OF (CHANDLER, ROBERT) , (CHANDLER, WENDELYN). RECEIPT # PAID .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2012
  • NOTICE OF RULING FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2012
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION RE: TO ADVANCE HEARING ON DEMURRERFILED. FILE SENT TO DEPT. 006 . RECEIPT # BH278865001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2012
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 006 , HON. LESLIEE BROWN PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: EX PARTE APPLICATIONFOR AN ORDER TO ADVANCE HEARON ON DEMURRER; .APPLICATION GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2012
  • ORDER RE: TO ADVANCE HEARING ON DEMURRER AND MOTION TOSTRIKE AND TO DENY SAME SIGNED BY LESLIE E BROWN ANDFILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2012
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (SILVERMAN REALTY CORP.) FORREJECTION OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO NAMEDDEFENDANTS A DEMURRER FILED AND SET FOR 03/20/12 8:30AMDEPT. 006, YOUR REQUEST ENTERED AS TO ANY AND ALL ONLYRE-SUBMIT YOUR WRIT PACKAGE AFTER COURT DATE. SUBMITTEDON02/21/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENTCLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED. SERVED AS TO(CHANDLER, WENDELYN) AND AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2012
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED. ***NOSUMMONS ISSUED***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2012
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (SILVERMAN REALTY CORP.) FORREJECTION OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT, DEMURRER ISSET ON 02/22/12 8;30, DEPT.006 AS TO BOTH DEFENDANTSSUBMITTED ON02/02/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT,UNLAWFULDETAINER FILED. SERVED AS TO (CHANDLER, ROBERT) . COSTSOF $ 63.34

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2012
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT AND P & A'S IN SUPPORT THEREOF FILEDBY (CHANDLER, ROBERT) , (CHANDLER, WENDELYN) , [VIA FAX]. MATTER NOTICED FOR HEARING ON 02/22/12 AT 08:30A MIN DEPT. 006 . RECEIPT # BH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN BH451225005.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2012
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2012
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2012
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVEPARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2012
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TODEPT. 006 OF HONORABLE LESLIE E BROWN .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2012
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TODEPT. 006 OF HONORABLE LESLIE E BROWN .

    Read MoreRead Less